THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
10/05/25 05:22:35 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicine and Dentistry, 2020
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 95 Spring Street
Almonte General Hospital
Family Medicine Obstetrics and Newborn Care
Mississippi Mills Ontario K0A 1A0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-256-2500
Extension: 2233
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 95 Spring Street
Ottawa Valley Family Health Team
Mississippi Mills Ontario K0A 1A0
Phone: (613) 256-9370
Fax: 613-256-0949
Address: 1053 Carling Ave
Ottawa Hospital Civic Campus
Maternal Newborn Care
Ottawa ON K1Y 4E9
Phone: 613-798-5555
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 08 Jun 2022
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 08 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Northwest Territories
Canada - Nunavut

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Almonte General Hospital Almonte
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Almonte General Hospital
LOCATION: Almonte

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicine and Dentistry, 2020

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 95 Spring Street
Almonte General Hospital
Family Medicine Obstetrics and Newborn Care
Mississippi Mills Ontario K0A 1A0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-256-2500
Extension: 2233
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 95 Spring Street
Ottawa Valley Family Health Team
Mississippi Mills Ontario K0A 1A0
Phone: (613) 256-9370
Fax: 613-256-0949
Address: 1053 Carling Ave
Ottawa Hospital Civic Campus
Maternal Newborn Care
Ottawa ON K1Y 4E9
Phone: 613-798-5555
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 08 Jun 2022
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 08 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Northwest Territories
Canada - Nunavut

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Almonte General Hospital Almonte
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Almonte General Hospital
LOCATION: Almonte

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MEGAN ANNE TAKPAN CROSBY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CROSBY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MEGAN ANNE TAKPAN CROSBY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CROSBY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicine and Dentistry, 2020

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Oct 2022
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2022
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2020
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 Oct 2022

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2022

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020