THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:53:58 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2020
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: PO Box 311
Red Lake Family Health Team
Red Lake ON P0V 2M0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 807-727-2751
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 21 Sep 2022
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 21 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Red Lake Margaret Cochenour Memorial Hospital Red Lake
HOSPITAL: Red Lake Margaret Cochenour Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Red Lake

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2020

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: PO Box 311
Red Lake Family Health Team
Red Lake ON P0V 2M0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 807-727-2751
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 21 Sep 2022
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 21 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Red Lake Margaret Cochenour Memorial Hospital Red Lake
HOSPITAL: Red Lake Margaret Cochenour Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Red Lake

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. IAN HARRISON DAVID LOBB may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LOBB is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. IAN HARRISON DAVID LOBB may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LOBB is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2020

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Oct 2022
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 26 Sep 2022
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2020
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Oct 2022

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 26 Sep 2022

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020