THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
22/05/25 04:17:21 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 2020
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 250 College Street
University of Toronto
Department of Psychiatry
8th Floor
Toronto Ontario M5T 1R8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416- 979-6911
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 2020

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 250 College Street
University of Toronto
Department of Psychiatry
8th Floor
Toronto Ontario M5T 1R8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416- 979-6911
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. VICTORIA IRIS RAE ANDERSON shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. ANDERSON is enrolled at University of Toronto;
(2) Dr. ANDERSON shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. ANDERSON is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. ANDERSON shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. ANDERSON is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. ANDERSON no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2026.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. VICTORIA IRIS RAE ANDERSON shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. ANDERSON is enrolled at University of Toronto;
(2) Dr. ANDERSON shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. ANDERSON is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. ANDERSON shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. ANDERSON is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. ANDERSON no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2026.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 2020
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
PostGrad Yr 6 - Child and Adolescent Psychiatry
06 Dec 2025 to 30 Jun 2026
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 5 - Child and Adolescent Psychiatry
01 Jul 2025 to 05 Dec 2025
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 5 - Child and Adolescent Psychiatry
04 Sep 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry
01 Jul 2024 to 03 Sep 2024
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry
04 Sep 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry
01 Jul 2023 to 03 Sep 2023
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry
03 Sep 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry
01 Jul 2022 to 02 Sep 2022
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry
01 Jul 2021 to 30 Jun 2022
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry
01 Jul 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 6 - Child and Adolescent Psychiatry
DATE: 06 Dec 2025 to 30 Jun 2026
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 5 - Child and Adolescent Psychiatry
DATE: 01 Jul 2025 to 05 Dec 2025
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 5 - Child and Adolescent Psychiatry
DATE: 04 Sep 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry
DATE: 01 Jul 2024 to 03 Sep 2024
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry
DATE: 04 Sep 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry
DATE: 01 Jul 2023 to 03 Sep 2023
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry
DATE: 03 Sep 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry
DATE: 01 Jul 2022 to 02 Sep 2022
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry
DATE: 01 Jul 2021 to 30 Jun 2022
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry
DATE: 01 Jul 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry: 30 Jun 2026
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2020
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 30 Jun 2026

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020