THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 04:44:13 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Université de Sherbrooke Faculté de Médecine et des Sciences de la Santé, 2020
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Children's Hospital of Eastern
Ontario (CHEO)
Division of Pediatrics
401 Smyth Rd
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 2024
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: Université de Sherbrooke Faculté de Médecine et des Sciences de la Santé, 2020

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Children's Hospital of Eastern
Ontario (CHEO)
Division of Pediatrics
401 Smyth Rd
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 2024
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LAURENCE BASTIEN shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. BASTIEN is enrolled at University of Ottawa;
(2) Dr. BASTIEN shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. BASTIEN is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. BASTIEN shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. BASTIEN is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. BASTIEN no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2025.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LAURENCE BASTIEN shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. BASTIEN is enrolled at University of Ottawa;
(2) Dr. BASTIEN shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. BASTIEN is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. BASTIEN shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. BASTIEN is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. BASTIEN no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2025.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Université de Sherbrooke Faculté de Médecine et des Sciences de la Santé, 2020
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
PostGrad Yr 5 - Pediatric Endocrinology and Metabolism
01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
University of Ottawa
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatric Endocrinology and Metabolism
01 Jul 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
University of Ottawa
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics
01 Jul 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
University of Ottawa
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics
01 Jul 2021 to 30 Jun 2022
University of Ottawa
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics
01 Jul 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
University of Ottawa
SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 5 - Pediatric Endocrinology and Metabolism
DATE: 01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatric Endocrinology and Metabolism
DATE: 01 Jul 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics
DATE: 01 Jul 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics
DATE: 01 Jul 2021 to 30 Jun 2022
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics
DATE: 01 Jul 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry: 30 Jun 2025
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2020
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 30 Jun 2025

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020