THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
16/05/25 04:45:51 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicine and Dentistry, 2020
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Parkwood Institute
Division of Physical Medicine and
Rehabilitation
550 Wellington Rd
London Ontario N6C 0A7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicine and Dentistry, 2020

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Parkwood Institute
Division of Physical Medicine and
Rehabilitation
550 Wellington Rd
London Ontario N6C 0A7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LAUREN MICHELLE CORMIER shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. CORMIER is enrolled at Western University;
(2) Dr. CORMIER shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. CORMIER is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. CORMIER shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. CORMIER is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. CORMIER no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2025.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LAUREN MICHELLE CORMIER shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. CORMIER is enrolled at Western University;
(2) Dr. CORMIER shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. CORMIER is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. CORMIER shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. CORMIER is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. CORMIER no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2025.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicine and Dentistry, 2020
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
PostGrad Yr 5 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
Western University
PostGrad Yr 4 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
01 Jul 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
Western University
PostGrad Yr 3 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
01 Jul 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
Western University
PostGrad Yr 2 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
01 Jul 2021 to 30 Jun 2022
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University
PostGrad Yr 1 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
01 Jul 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University
SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 5 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
DATE: 01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY: Western University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 4 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
DATE: 01 Jul 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
UNIVERSITY: Western University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 3 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
DATE: 01 Jul 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
UNIVERSITY: Western University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 2 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
DATE: 01 Jul 2021 to 30 Jun 2022
UNIVERSITY: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 1 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
DATE: 01 Jul 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
UNIVERSITY: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry: 30 Jun 2025
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2020
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 30 Jun 2025

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020