THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 05:00:18 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 2020
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Kingston General Hospital
Division of Psychiatry
76 Stuart St
Kingston Ontario K7L 2V7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 548-3232
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 2020

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Kingston General Hospital
Division of Psychiatry
76 Stuart St
Kingston Ontario K7L 2V7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 548-3232
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MASA CALIC shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. CALIC is enrolled at University of Toronto;
(2) Dr. CALIC shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. CALIC is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. CALIC shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. CALIC is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. CALIC no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2026.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MASA CALIC shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. CALIC is enrolled at University of Toronto;
(2) Dr. CALIC shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. CALIC is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. CALIC shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. CALIC is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. CALIC no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2026.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 2020
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
PostGrad Yr 6 - Child and Adolescent Psychiatry
06 May 2026 to 30 Jun 2026
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 5 - Child and Adolescent Psychiatry
01 Jul 2025 to 05 May 2026
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 5 - Child and Adolescent Psychiatry
06 May 2025 to 30 Jun 2025
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry
08 Apr 2025 to 05 May 2025
Queen's University
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry
01 Jul 2024 to 07 Apr 2025
Queen's University
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry
10 Apr 2024 to 30 Jun 2024
Queen's University
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry
01 Jul 2023 to 09 Apr 2024
Queen's University
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry
10 Apr 2023 to 30 Jun 2023
Queen's University
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry
12 Sep 2022 to 09 Apr 2023
Queen's University
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry
01 Jul 2022 to 11 Sep 2022
Queen's University
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry
01 Jul 2021 to 30 Jun 2022
Queen's University
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry
23 Sep 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
Queen's University
AVP - Psychiatry
01 Jul 2020 to 22 Sep 2020
Queen's University
SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 6 - Child and Adolescent Psychiatry
DATE: 06 May 2026 to 30 Jun 2026
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 5 - Child and Adolescent Psychiatry
DATE: 01 Jul 2025 to 05 May 2026
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 5 - Child and Adolescent Psychiatry
DATE: 06 May 2025 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry
DATE: 08 Apr 2025 to 05 May 2025
UNIVERSITY: Queen's University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry
DATE: 01 Jul 2024 to 07 Apr 2025
UNIVERSITY: Queen's University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry
DATE: 10 Apr 2024 to 30 Jun 2024
UNIVERSITY: Queen's University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry
DATE: 01 Jul 2023 to 09 Apr 2024
UNIVERSITY: Queen's University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry
DATE: 10 Apr 2023 to 30 Jun 2023
UNIVERSITY: Queen's University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry
DATE: 12 Sep 2022 to 09 Apr 2023
UNIVERSITY: Queen's University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry
DATE: 01 Jul 2022 to 11 Sep 2022
UNIVERSITY: Queen's University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry
DATE: 01 Jul 2021 to 30 Jun 2022
UNIVERSITY: Queen's University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry
DATE: 23 Sep 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
UNIVERSITY: Queen's University

SPECIALTY: AVP - Psychiatry
DATE: 01 Jul 2020 to 22 Sep 2020
UNIVERSITY: Queen's University

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry: 30 Jun 2026
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Sep 2020
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2020
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 30 Jun 2026

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Sep 2020

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020