THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
10/05/25 04:24:27 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Université de Montréal Faculté de Médecine, 2020
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, MANDARIN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1111 Ghislain St
Hawkesbury & District General Hospital
Family medicine
Hawkesbury ON K6A 3G5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 632-1111
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 201A-1205 Bow Valley Trail
Mountain Maternity and Family Medicine
Canmore AB T1W 1P5
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Aug 2022
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 22 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Alberta

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, MANDARIN
Medical School: Université de Montréal Faculté de Médecine, 2020

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1111 Ghislain St
Hawkesbury & District General Hospital
Family medicine
Hawkesbury ON K6A 3G5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 632-1111
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 201A-1205 Bow Valley Trail
Mountain Maternity and Family Medicine
Canmore AB T1W 1P5
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Aug 2022
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 22 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Alberta

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ZI YUE WANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WANG is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ZI YUE WANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WANG is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Université de Montréal Faculté de Médecine, 2020

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Aug 2022
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2020
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Aug 2022

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020