THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
10/05/25 05:03:21 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: King Saud University, Riyadh College of Medicine, 2017
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Mount Sinai Hospital
600 University Ave
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: King Saud University, Riyadh College of Medicine, 2017

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Mount Sinai Hospital
600 University Ave
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AHMED HUSSAIN S SALEEM shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. SALEEM is enrolled at University of Toronto;
(2) Dr. SALEEM shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. SALEEM is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. SALEEM shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. SALEEM is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. SALEEM no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2025.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AHMED HUSSAIN S SALEEM shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. SALEEM is enrolled at University of Toronto;
(2) Dr. SALEEM shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. SALEEM is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. SALEEM shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. SALEEM is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. SALEEM no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2025.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: King Saud University, Riyadh College of Medicine, 2017
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
PostGrad Yr 5 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
02 Nov 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 5 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
17 Sep 2024 to 01 Nov 2024
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 4 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
01 Jul 2024 to 16 Sep 2024
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 4 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
17 Sep 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 3 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
01 Jul 2023 to 16 Sep 2023
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 3 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
17 Sep 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 2 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
01 Jul 2022 to 16 Sep 2022
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 2 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
22 Aug 2021 to 30 Jun 2022
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 1 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
01 Jul 2021 to 21 Aug 2021
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 1 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
22 Aug 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
University of Toronto
PEAP - R - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
01 Jul 2020 to 21 Aug 2020
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 5 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
DATE: 02 Nov 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 5 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
DATE: 17 Sep 2024 to 01 Nov 2024
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 4 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
DATE: 01 Jul 2024 to 16 Sep 2024
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 4 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
DATE: 17 Sep 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 3 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
DATE: 01 Jul 2023 to 16 Sep 2023
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 3 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
DATE: 17 Sep 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 2 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
DATE: 01 Jul 2022 to 16 Sep 2022
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 2 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
DATE: 22 Aug 2021 to 30 Jun 2022
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 1 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
DATE: 01 Jul 2021 to 21 Aug 2021
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 1 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
DATE: 22 Aug 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PEAP - R - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
DATE: 01 Jul 2020 to 21 Aug 2020
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry: 30 Jun 2025
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Aug 2020
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2020
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 30 Jun 2025

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Aug 2020

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020