THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
11/05/25 17:48:41 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 2020
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3805 Brockton Crescent
North Vancouver British Columbia V7G 1R5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6042029295
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 2020

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3805 Brockton Crescent
North Vancouver British Columbia V7G 1R5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6042029295
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RYAN MICHAEL TRAINOR shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. TRAINOR is enrolled at McMaster University;
(2) Dr. TRAINOR shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. TRAINOR is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. TRAINOR shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. TRAINOR is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. TRAINOR no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2025.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RYAN MICHAEL TRAINOR shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. TRAINOR is enrolled at McMaster University;
(2) Dr. TRAINOR shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. TRAINOR is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. TRAINOR shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. TRAINOR is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. TRAINOR no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2025.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 2020
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
McMaster University
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
01 Jul 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
McMaster University
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
10 Oct 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
McMaster University
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
01 Jul 2022 to 09 Oct 2022
McMaster University
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
27 May 2022 to 30 Jun 2022
McMaster University
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
26 Oct 2021 to 26 May 2022
McMaster University
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
01 Jul 2021 to 25 Oct 2021
McMaster University
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
20 Oct 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
McMaster University
SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
DATE: 10 Oct 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2022 to 09 Oct 2022
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
DATE: 27 May 2022 to 30 Jun 2022
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
DATE: 26 Oct 2021 to 26 May 2022
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2021 to 25 Oct 2021
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
DATE: 20 Oct 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry: 30 Jun 2025
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Dec 2023
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2021
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Oct 2020
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2020
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 30 Jun 2025

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Dec 2023

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2021

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Oct 2020

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020