THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
24/05/25 04:29:09 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2020
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ROMANIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1099 Kingston Road
Unit 217
Pickering Ontario L1V 1B5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 647-366-2343
Fax: 647-366-2344
Address: 1598 Queensville Sideroad
PO Box 201
VivaWell Medical
East Gwillimbury Ontario L0G 1R0
Phone: 289-212-VIVA
Fax: 647-370-5949
Address: 1939 Kennedy Road
Toronto Ontario M1P 2L9
Phone: 647-625-8799
Fax: 1-877-269-0507

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 11 Sep 2024
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 11 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ROMANIAN
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2020

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1099 Kingston Road
Unit 217
Pickering Ontario L1V 1B5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 647-366-2343
Fax: 647-366-2344
Address: 1598 Queensville Sideroad
PO Box 201
VivaWell Medical
East Gwillimbury Ontario L0G 1R0
Phone: 289-212-VIVA
Fax: 647-370-5949
Address: 1939 Kennedy Road
Toronto Ontario M1P 2L9
Phone: 647-625-8799
Fax: 1-877-269-0507

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 11 Sep 2024
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 11 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALBERT RAZVAN GHEORGHITA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GHEORGHITA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALBERT RAZVAN GHEORGHITA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GHEORGHITA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2020

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Sep 2024
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 17 Sep 2024
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2020
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Sep 2024

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 17 Sep 2024

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020