THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:28:49 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2020
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 201-200 Catharine St
Port Colborne ON L3K 4K8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 289-478-5221
Fax: 905-834-9067

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 07 Jun 2022
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 07 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Niagara Health System Niagara Falls
HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System
LOCATION: Niagara Falls

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Raven Zytaruk-Mancini Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 May 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Zytaruk-Mancini (CPSO#: 122105 )
Business Address: 200 Catharine Street
Port Colborne Ontario L3K 4K8

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2020

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 201-200 Catharine St
Port Colborne ON L3K 4K8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 289-478-5221
Fax: 905-834-9067

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 07 Jun 2022
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 07 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Niagara Health System Niagara Falls
HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System
LOCATION: Niagara Falls

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Raven Zytaruk-Mancini Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 May 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Zytaruk-Mancini (CPSO#: 122105 )
Business Address: 200 Catharine Street
Port Colborne Ontario L3K 4K8

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RAVEN LEE ZYTARUK-MANCINI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZYTARUK-MANCINI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RAVEN LEE ZYTARUK-MANCINI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZYTARUK-MANCINI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2020

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jul 2022
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2022
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2020
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Jul 2022

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2022

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020