THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
10/05/25 05:01:18 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Alexandria University Faculty of Medicine, 2016
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: UHN Toronto General Hospital
Divsion of Gastroenterology
200 Elizabeth St
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 340-3131
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Alexandria University Faculty of Medicine, 2016

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: UHN Toronto General Hospital
Divsion of Gastroenterology
200 Elizabeth St
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 340-3131
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MAI MAGDY ELSAYED AHMED KILANY may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. KILANY is enrolled at University of Toronto;
(2) Dr. KILANY shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. KILANY is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. KILANY shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:
(i) When Dr. KILANY ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,
(ii) When Dr. KILANY ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or
(iii) When five years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2025.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MAI MAGDY ELSAYED AHMED KILANY may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. KILANY is enrolled at University of Toronto;
(2) Dr. KILANY shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. KILANY is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. KILANY shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:
(i) When Dr. KILANY ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,
(ii) When Dr. KILANY ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or
(iii) When five years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2025.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Alexandria University Faculty of Medicine, 2016
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology
01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology
01 Jul 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology
01 Jul 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology
01 Jul 2021 to 30 Jun 2022
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology
23 Sep 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
University of Toronto
PEAP - CF - Gastroenterology
01 Jul 2020 to 22 Sep 2020
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology
DATE: 01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology
DATE: 01 Jul 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology
DATE: 01 Jul 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology
DATE: 01 Jul 2021 to 30 Jun 2022
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology
DATE: 23 Sep 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PEAP - CF - Gastroenterology
DATE: 01 Jul 2020 to 22 Sep 2020
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry: 30 Jun 2025
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Sep 2020
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2020
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 30 Jun 2025

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Sep 2020

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020