THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:27:08 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Calgary, 2015
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 500-1110 Sheppard Ave E
North York ON M2K 2W2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4165122578
Extension: 2
Fax: 6477271774
Address: North York General Hospital
4001 Leslie St
North York ON M2K 1E1
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 15 Nov 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 15 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North York General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Calgary, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 500-1110 Sheppard Ave E
North York ON M2K 2W2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4165122578
Extension: 2
Fax: 6477271774
Address: North York General Hospital
4001 Leslie St
North York ON M2K 1E1
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 15 Nov 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 15 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North York General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANGELA CHRISTINE DEANE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DEANE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANGELA CHRISTINE DEANE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DEANE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Calgary, 2015

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Dec 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 24 Jul 2020
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 2020
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Dec 2020

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 24 Jul 2020

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Jul 2020