THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/05/25 03:38:10 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Dublin Trinity College, 2020
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Ottawa Hospital General Campus
Department of Obstetrics and
Gynecology
501 Smyth Rd
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: University of Dublin Trinity College, 2020

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Ottawa Hospital General Campus
Department of Obstetrics and
Gynecology
501 Smyth Rd
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BREANNA RACHEL FLYNN shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. FLYNN is enrolled at University of Ottawa;
(2) Dr. FLYNN shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. FLYNN is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. FLYNN shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. FLYNN is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. FLYNN no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: This certificate expires on 3 June, 2026.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BREANNA RACHEL FLYNN shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. FLYNN is enrolled at University of Ottawa;
(2) Dr. FLYNN shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. FLYNN is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. FLYNN shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. FLYNN is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. FLYNN no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: This certificate expires on 3 June, 2026.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Dublin Trinity College, 2020
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
01 Jul 2025 to 03 Jun 2026
University of Ottawa
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
04 Jun 2025 to 30 Jun 2025
University of Ottawa
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
01 Jul 2024 to 03 Jun 2025
University of Ottawa
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
01 Jul 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
University of Ottawa
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
03 Aug 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
University of Ottawa
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
01 Jul 2022 to 02 Aug 2022
University of Ottawa
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
01 Jul 2021 to 30 Jun 2022
University of Ottawa
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
23 Sep 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
University of Ottawa
AVP - Obstetrics and Gynecology
01 Jul 2020 to 22 Sep 2020
University of Ottawa
SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
DATE: 01 Jul 2025 to 03 Jun 2026
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
DATE: 04 Jun 2025 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
DATE: 01 Jul 2024 to 03 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
DATE: 01 Jul 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
DATE: 03 Aug 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
DATE: 01 Jul 2022 to 02 Aug 2022
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
DATE: 01 Jul 2021 to 30 Jun 2022
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
DATE: 23 Sep 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: AVP - Obstetrics and Gynecology
DATE: 01 Jul 2020 to 22 Sep 2020
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry: 03 Jun 2026
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Sep 2020
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2020
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 03 Jun 2026

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Sep 2020

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020