THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 04:55:30 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Medical University of the Americas (Nevis), 2019
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ITALIAN, SPANISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 4-3590 Rutherford Rd
3rd Floor
Woodbridge ON L4H 3T8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 289-236-1700
Fax: 905-225-6540

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Dec 2022
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 06 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ITALIAN, SPANISH
Medical School: Medical University of the Americas (Nevis), 2019

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 4-3590 Rutherford Rd
3rd Floor
Woodbridge ON L4H 3T8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 289-236-1700
Fax: 905-225-6540

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Dec 2022
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 06 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NANCY CICCONE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CICCONE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NANCY CICCONE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CICCONE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Medical University of the Americas (Nevis), 2019

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jan 2023
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 19 Dec 2022
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Sep 2020
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2020
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Jan 2023

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 19 Dec 2022

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Sep 2020

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020