THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
14/05/25 04:48:23 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2020
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1200 Main St W
McMaster University Medical Centre
Department of Anesthesia
Hamilton Ontario L8N 3Z5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 521-2100
Extension: 75166
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2020

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1200 Main St W
McMaster University Medical Centre
Department of Anesthesia
Hamilton Ontario L8N 3Z5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 521-2100
Extension: 75166
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOHN JUNWON SHIN shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. SHIN is enrolled at McMaster University;
(2) Dr. SHIN shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. SHIN is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. SHIN shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. SHIN is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. SHIN no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: This certificate expires on 31 January, 2026.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOHN JUNWON SHIN shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. SHIN is enrolled at McMaster University;
(2) Dr. SHIN shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. SHIN is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. SHIN shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. SHIN is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. SHIN no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: This certificate expires on 31 January, 2026.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2020
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology
01 Jul 2025 to 31 Jan 2026
McMaster University
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology
01 Feb 2025 to 30 Jun 2025
McMaster University
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology
01 Jul 2024 to 31 Jan 2025
McMaster University
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology
01 Feb 2024 to 30 Jun 2024
McMaster University
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology
01 Jul 2023 to 31 Jan 2024
McMaster University
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology
01 Feb 2023 to 30 Jun 2023
McMaster University
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology
01 Jul 2022 to 31 Jan 2023
McMaster University
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology
01 Feb 2022 to 30 Jun 2022
McMaster University
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology
01 Jul 2021 to 31 Jan 2022
McMaster University
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
01 Jul 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
McMaster University
SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology
DATE: 01 Jul 2025 to 31 Jan 2026
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology
DATE: 01 Feb 2025 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology
DATE: 01 Jul 2024 to 31 Jan 2025
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology
DATE: 01 Feb 2024 to 30 Jun 2024
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology
DATE: 01 Jul 2023 to 31 Jan 2024
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology
DATE: 01 Feb 2023 to 30 Jun 2023
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology
DATE: 01 Jul 2022 to 31 Jan 2023
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology
DATE: 01 Feb 2022 to 30 Jun 2022
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology
DATE: 01 Jul 2021 to 31 Jan 2022
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry: 31 Jan 2026
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2024
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 04 Apr 2024
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2020
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 31 Jan 2026

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2024

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Apr 2024
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 04 Apr 2024

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020