THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 04:25:49 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Université de Montréal Faculté de Médecine, 2018
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, PANJABI/PUNJABI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 218 - 4190 Finch Ave E
Scarborough Ontario M1S 4T7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-497-4403
Fax: 416-497-7276

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Dec 2020
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 09 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, PANJABI/PUNJABI
Medical School: Université de Montréal Faculté de Médecine, 2018

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 218 - 4190 Finch Ave E
Scarborough Ontario M1S 4T7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-497-4403
Fax: 416-497-7276

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Dec 2020
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 09 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HARPREET KAUR MATHAROO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MATHAROO is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HARPREET KAUR MATHAROO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MATHAROO is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Université de Montréal Faculté de Médecine, 2018

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2021
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 15 Dec 2020
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2020
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Jun 2021

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 15 Dec 2020

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020