THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 03:40:47 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Ruth and Bruce Rappaport Faculty of Medicine, Technion Israel Institute of Technology, 2011
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Peter Munk Cardiac Centre
Division of Infectious Diseases
585 University Ave
Toronto Ontario M5G 2N2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Ruth and Bruce Rappaport Faculty of Medicine, Technion Israel Institute of Technology, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Peter Munk Cardiac Centre
Division of Infectious Diseases
585 University Ave
Toronto Ontario M5G 2N2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RONI BITTERMAN may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. BITTERMAN is enrolled at University of Toronto;
(2) Dr. BITTERMAN shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. BITTERMAN is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. BITTERMAN shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:
(i) When Dr. BITTERMAN ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,
(ii) When Dr. BITTERMAN ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or
(iii) When five years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 September, 2025.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RONI BITTERMAN may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. BITTERMAN is enrolled at University of Toronto;
(2) Dr. BITTERMAN shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. BITTERMAN is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. BITTERMAN shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:
(i) When Dr. BITTERMAN ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,
(ii) When Dr. BITTERMAN ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or
(iii) When five years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 September, 2025.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Ruth and Bruce Rappaport Faculty of Medicine, Technion Israel Institute of Technology, 2011
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
Clinical Fellow - Infectious Diseases
01 Jul 2025 to 30 Sep 2025
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Infectious Diseases
01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Infectious Diseases
01 Oct 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Infectious Diseases
01 Jul 2023 to 30 Sep 2023
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Infectious Diseases
01 Oct 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Infectious Diseases
01 Jul 2022 to 30 Sep 2022
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Infectious Diseases
01 Oct 2021 to 30 Jun 2022
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Infectious Diseases
01 Jul 2021 to 30 Sep 2021
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Infectious Diseases
24 Dec 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
University of Toronto
PEAP - CF - Infectious Diseases
01 Oct 2020 to 23 Dec 2020
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Infectious Diseases
DATE: 01 Jul 2025 to 30 Sep 2025
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Infectious Diseases
DATE: 01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Infectious Diseases
DATE: 01 Oct 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Infectious Diseases
DATE: 01 Jul 2023 to 30 Sep 2023
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Infectious Diseases
DATE: 01 Oct 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Infectious Diseases
DATE: 01 Jul 2022 to 30 Sep 2022
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Infectious Diseases
DATE: 01 Oct 2021 to 30 Jun 2022
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Infectious Diseases
DATE: 01 Jul 2021 to 30 Sep 2021
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Infectious Diseases
DATE: 24 Dec 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PEAP - CF - Infectious Diseases
DATE: 01 Oct 2020 to 23 Dec 2020
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry: 30 Sep 2025
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2020
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2020
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 30 Sep 2025

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Oct 2020

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Oct 2020