THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 03:11:57 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: King Saud University, Riyadh College of Medicine, 2018
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto General Hospital
Department of Medicine
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 340-4800
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC
Medical School: King Saud University, Riyadh College of Medicine, 2018

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto General Hospital
Department of Medicine
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 340-4800
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NORAH ALNEGHEIMISH shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. ALNEGHEIMISH is enrolled at University of Toronto;
(2) Dr. ALNEGHEIMISH shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. ALNEGHEIMISH is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. ALNEGHEIMISH shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. ALNEGHEIMISH is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. ALNEGHEIMISH no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2025.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NORAH ALNEGHEIMISH shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. ALNEGHEIMISH is enrolled at University of Toronto;
(2) Dr. ALNEGHEIMISH shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. ALNEGHEIMISH is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. ALNEGHEIMISH shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. ALNEGHEIMISH is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. ALNEGHEIMISH no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2025.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: King Saud University, Riyadh College of Medicine, 2018
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
PostGrad Yr 5 - Hematology
01 Jul 2025 to 14 Jan 2026
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 5 - Hematology
15 Jan 2025 to 30 Jun 2025
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 4 - Hematology
01 Sep 2024 to 14 Jan 2025
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 4 - Hematology
01 Jul 2024 to 31 Aug 2024
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 4 - Hematology
15 Jan 2024 to 30 Jun 2024
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
01 Jan 2024 to 14 Jan 2024
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
21 Sep 2023 to 31 Dec 2023
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
01 Jul 2023 to 20 Sep 2023
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
21 Sep 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
01 Jul 2022 to 20 Sep 2022
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
21 Sep 2021 to 30 Jun 2022
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
01 Jul 2021 to 20 Sep 2021
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
05 Oct 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
University of Toronto
PEAP - R - Internal Medicine
13 Jul 2020 to 04 Oct 2020
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 5 - Hematology
DATE: 01 Jul 2025 to 14 Jan 2026
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 5 - Hematology
DATE: 15 Jan 2025 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 4 - Hematology
DATE: 01 Sep 2024 to 14 Jan 2025
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 4 - Hematology
DATE: 01 Jul 2024 to 31 Aug 2024
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 4 - Hematology
DATE: 15 Jan 2024 to 30 Jun 2024
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
DATE: 01 Jan 2024 to 14 Jan 2024
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
DATE: 21 Sep 2023 to 31 Dec 2023
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2023 to 20 Sep 2023
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
DATE: 21 Sep 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2022 to 20 Sep 2022
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
DATE: 21 Sep 2021 to 30 Jun 2022
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2021 to 20 Sep 2021
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
DATE: 05 Oct 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PEAP - R - Internal Medicine
DATE: 13 Jul 2020 to 04 Oct 2020
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry: 30 Jun 2025
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Sep 2020
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 13 Jul 2020
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 30 Jun 2025

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Sep 2020

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Jul 2020