THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
20/05/25 04:29:58 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Health Sciences Lahore, 2009
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 50 Charlton Ave E
St Joseph Health care hamilton
Hamilton ON L8N 4A6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1960 Appleby Line
Suite 14
Burlington Ontario L7L 0B7
Phone: 905.331.5438
Fax: 905.331.2169
Address: 760 Brant Street
Unit 2 and 3
Burlington Ontario L7R 4B8
Phone: 905.637.7606
Fax: 905.637.2139
Address: 2200 Fairview Street
Suite 108
Burlington Ontario L7R 4H9
Phone: 905.333.6700
Fax: 905.333.2670
Address: 2951 Walkers Line
Burlington Ontario L7M 4Y1
Phone: 905.336.2202
Fax: 905.336.9596
Address: Medical Arts
1 Young Street
Suite 105
Hamilton Ontario L8N 1T8
Phone: 905-522-2344
Fax: 905-522-5278
Address: Westmount
723 Rymal Rd West
Suite 600
Hamilton Ontario L9B 2W2
Phone: 905-388-0106
Fax: 905-388-0313
Address: Heritage
325 Winterberry Drive
Suite 105
Hamilton Ontario L8J OB6
Phone: 905.549.0433
Fax: 905.549.5676
Address: 115 Parkdale Avenue South
Hamilton Ontario L8K 6K4
Phone: 905.547.3511
Fax: 905.547.5278
Address: Central Booking Centre
1 Young Street
Suite 209
Hamilton Ontario L8N 1T8
Phone: 905.635.7700
Fax: 905.592.4799
Address: Corporate Office
1 Young Street
Suite 218
Hamilton Ontario L8N 1T8
Phone: 905.572.6868
Fax: 905.572.6860
Address: Palermo
2525 Old Bronte Rd
Suite 140
Oakville Ontario L6M 4J2
Phone: 905.469.2524
Fax: 905.469.3555
Address: 1060 Speers Road
Suite 111
Oakville Ontario L6L 2X4
Phone: 905.844.0181
Fax: 905.844.0182
Address: 15 Mountain Avenue South
Stoney Creek Ontario L8G 2V6
Phone: 905.662.4953
Fax: 905.662.1774
Address: 245 Dundas Street East
Unit 7 and 8
Waterdown Ontario L8B 0E9
Phone: 905.689.0877
Fax: 905.689.9918

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 01 Aug 2023
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 01 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, URDU
Medical School: University of Health Sciences Lahore, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 50 Charlton Ave E
St Joseph Health care hamilton
Hamilton ON L8N 4A6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1960 Appleby Line
Suite 14
Burlington Ontario L7L 0B7
Phone: 905.331.5438
Fax: 905.331.2169
Address: 760 Brant Street
Unit 2 and 3
Burlington Ontario L7R 4B8
Phone: 905.637.7606
Fax: 905.637.2139
Address: 2200 Fairview Street
Suite 108
Burlington Ontario L7R 4H9
Phone: 905.333.6700
Fax: 905.333.2670
Address: 2951 Walkers Line
Burlington Ontario L7M 4Y1
Phone: 905.336.2202
Fax: 905.336.9596
Address: Medical Arts
1 Young Street
Suite 105
Hamilton Ontario L8N 1T8
Phone: 905-522-2344
Fax: 905-522-5278
Address: Westmount
723 Rymal Rd West
Suite 600
Hamilton Ontario L9B 2W2
Phone: 905-388-0106
Fax: 905-388-0313
Address: Heritage
325 Winterberry Drive
Suite 105
Hamilton Ontario L8J OB6
Phone: 905.549.0433
Fax: 905.549.5676
Address: 115 Parkdale Avenue South
Hamilton Ontario L8K 6K4
Phone: 905.547.3511
Fax: 905.547.5278
Address: Central Booking Centre
1 Young Street
Suite 209
Hamilton Ontario L8N 1T8
Phone: 905.635.7700
Fax: 905.592.4799
Address: Corporate Office
1 Young Street
Suite 218
Hamilton Ontario L8N 1T8
Phone: 905.572.6868
Fax: 905.572.6860
Address: Palermo
2525 Old Bronte Rd
Suite 140
Oakville Ontario L6M 4J2
Phone: 905.469.2524
Fax: 905.469.3555
Address: 1060 Speers Road
Suite 111
Oakville Ontario L6L 2X4
Phone: 905.844.0181
Fax: 905.844.0182
Address: 15 Mountain Avenue South
Stoney Creek Ontario L8G 2V6
Phone: 905.662.4953
Fax: 905.662.1774
Address: 245 Dundas Street East
Unit 7 and 8
Waterdown Ontario L8B 0E9
Phone: 905.689.0877
Fax: 905.689.9918

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 01 Aug 2023
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 01 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
01 Aug 2023
30 Jun 2026
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Aug 01 2023
EXPIRY DATE: Jun 30 2026
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. KHUNSA FAIZ may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Medical Imaging, Division of Radiology/Neuroradiology, McMaster University, in which Dr. FAIZ holds an academic appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of her academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from the date of issuance or when Dr. FAIZ no longer holds the academic appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the College receives a report indicating that Dr. FAIZ’s clinical performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or

(ii) the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. FAIZ’s certificate of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment report.

Note: This certificate is issued on 01 August, 2023, and expires on 30 June, 2026. Upon renewal of Dr. FAIZ's academic appointment at McMaster University, the expiry date can be extended, subject to the limitations in paragraphs 2 and 3 above.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. KHUNSA FAIZ may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Medical Imaging, Division of Radiology/Neuroradiology, McMaster University, in which Dr. FAIZ holds an academic appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of her academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from the date of issuance or when Dr. FAIZ no longer holds the academic appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the College receives a report indicating that Dr. FAIZ’s clinical performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or

(ii) the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. FAIZ’s certificate of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment report.

Note: This certificate is issued on 01 August, 2023, and expires on 30 June, 2026. Upon renewal of Dr. FAIZ's academic appointment at McMaster University, the expiry date can be extended, subject to the limitations in paragraphs 2 and 3 above.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Health Sciences Lahore, 2009

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2023
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2023
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Sep 2020
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2020
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Aug 2023
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Aug 2023
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration by Registration Committee.
Date: Expiry: 30 Jun 2026

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2023

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Sep 2020

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Aug 2020