THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 04:21:02 AM

General Information

Former Name: Srubiski, Aviva (Used Until: 11 Jun 2020)
Medical School: University of Sydney, Sydney Medical School, 2010
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 8760 Jane Street
8760 Jane street Unit 103
Vaughan Ontario L4K 4V3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9056952505
Fax: 905.695.2508

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
Effective: 21 Nov 2022
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 21 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Aviva Fliker
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 19 May 2021

General Information

Former Name: Srubiski, Aviva (Used Until: 11 Jun 2020)
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Sydney, Sydney Medical School, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 8760 Jane Street
8760 Jane street Unit 103
Vaughan Ontario L4K 4V3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9056952505
Fax: 905.695.2508

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
Effective: 21 Nov 2022
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 21 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Aviva Fliker
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 19 May 2021

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AVIVA FLIKER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FLIKER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AVIVA FLIKER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FLIKER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Sydney, Sydney Medical School, 2010

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Jan 2024
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 19 Mar 2021
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 14 Dec 2020
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 13 Jul 2020
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 31 Jan 2024

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 19 Mar 2021

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 14 Dec 2020

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Jul 2020
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 13 Jul 2020