THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
24/05/25 04:26:35 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Peking University Health Science Center, 2012
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Mount Sinai Hospital
600 University Ave
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 596-4200
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Women's College Hospital
76 Grenville St
Toronto ON M5S 1B2
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anatomical Pathology
Effective: 04 Aug 2020
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Anatomical Pathology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 04 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sinai Health System Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Peking University Health Science Center, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Mount Sinai Hospital
600 University Ave
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 596-4200
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Women's College Hospital
76 Grenville St
Toronto ON M5S 1B2
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anatomical Pathology
Effective: 04 Aug 2020
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Anatomical Pathology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 04 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sinai Health System Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
14 Jan 2022
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Jan 14 2022
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. LINGXIN ZHANG may practise medicine independently in anatomical pathology.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. LINGXIN ZHANG may practise medicine independently in anatomical pathology.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Peking University Health Science Center, 2012

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 14 Jan 2022
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 07 Oct 2020
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 04 Aug 2020
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 14 Jan 2022

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 07 Oct 2020

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Aug 2020
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 04 Aug 2020