THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
23/05/25 03:33:08 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Sultan Qaboos University College of Medicine, 2018
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 699 Concession Street
Hamilton Ontario L8V 4X2
Business Email: [email protected]
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 14 Aug 2024
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 14 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Brant Community Healthcare System Brantford
HOSPITAL: Brant Community Healthcare System
LOCATION: Brantford

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC
Medical School: Sultan Qaboos University College of Medicine, 2018

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 699 Concession Street
Hamilton Ontario L8V 4X2
Business Email: [email protected]
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 14 Aug 2024
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 14 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Brant Community Healthcare System Brantford
HOSPITAL: Brant Community Healthcare System
LOCATION: Brantford

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ZAINAB ALI AMER AL MAQRASHI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AL MAQRASHI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ZAINAB ALI AMER AL MAQRASHI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AL MAQRASHI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Sultan Qaboos University College of Medicine, 2018

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Nov 2024
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Sep 2020
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 28 Jul 2020
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Nov 2024

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Sep 2020

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Jul 2020