THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 04:14:32 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 2020
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 80 McGonigal St W
c/o Emergency Services
Arnprior ON K7S 1M3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 1-844-727-6404
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Aug 2022
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 19 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 2020

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 80 McGonigal St W
c/o Emergency Services
Arnprior ON K7S 1M3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 1-844-727-6404
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Aug 2022
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 19 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. WEN XIAO WEI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WEI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. WEN XIAO WEI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WEI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 2020

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2022
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 22 Aug 2022
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Jul 2020
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2022

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 22 Aug 2022

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Jul 2020