THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:29:20 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Sharjah, 2016
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 04 Jun 2024
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 04 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Sharjah, 2016

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 04 Jun 2024
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 04 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Sharjah, 2016
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine
01 Dec 2023 to 03 Jun 2024
McMaster University
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
15 Nov 2023 to 30 Nov 2023
McMaster University
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
26 Jun 2023 to 14 Nov 2023
McMaster University
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
15 Nov 2022 to 25 Jun 2023
McMaster University
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
01 Jul 2022 to 14 Nov 2022
McMaster University
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
22 Sep 2021 to 30 Jun 2022
McMaster University
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
01 Jul 2021 to 21 Sep 2021
McMaster University
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
22 Sep 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
McMaster University
PEAP - R - Internal Medicine
28 Jul 2020 to 21 Sep 2020
McMaster University
SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine
DATE: 01 Dec 2023 to 03 Jun 2024
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
DATE: 15 Nov 2023 to 30 Nov 2023
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
DATE: 26 Jun 2023 to 14 Nov 2023
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
DATE: 15 Nov 2022 to 25 Jun 2023
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2022 to 14 Nov 2022
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
DATE: 22 Sep 2021 to 30 Jun 2022
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2021 to 21 Sep 2021
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
DATE: 22 Sep 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: PEAP - R - Internal Medicine
DATE: 28 Jul 2020 to 21 Sep 2020
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 03 Jun 2024
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Sep 2020
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 28 Jul 2020
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 03 Jun 2024

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Sep 2020

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Jul 2020