THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 04:01:46 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: King Saud Bin Abdulaziz University, 2016
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 600 University Ave
Toronto ON M5G 1X5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: King Saud Bin Abdulaziz University, 2016

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 600 University Ave
Toronto ON M5G 1X5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. OSAMA MOEENALDEEN D AL SAYED shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. AL SAYED is enrolled at University of Toronto;
(2) Dr. AL SAYED shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. AL SAYED is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. AL SAYED shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. AL SAYED is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. AL SAYED no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: This certificate expires on 24 August, 2025.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. OSAMA MOEENALDEEN D AL SAYED shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. AL SAYED is enrolled at University of Toronto;
(2) Dr. AL SAYED shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. AL SAYED is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. AL SAYED shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. AL SAYED is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. AL SAYED no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: This certificate expires on 24 August, 2025.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: King Saud Bin Abdulaziz University, 2016
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology
01 Jul 2025 to 24 Aug 2025
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology
25 Sep 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 4 - Gastroenterology
01 Jul 2024 to 24 Sep 2024
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 4 - Gastroenterology
25 Sep 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
01 Jul 2023 to 24 Sep 2023
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
23 Oct 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
01 Jul 2022 to 22 Oct 2022
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
23 Oct 2021 to 30 Jun 2022
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
30 Jul 2021 to 22 Oct 2021
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
21 Oct 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University
PEAP - R - Internal Medicine
28 Jul 2020 to 20 Oct 2020
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University
SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology
DATE: 01 Jul 2025 to 24 Aug 2025
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology
DATE: 25 Sep 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 4 - Gastroenterology
DATE: 01 Jul 2024 to 24 Sep 2024
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 4 - Gastroenterology
DATE: 25 Sep 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2023 to 24 Sep 2023
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
DATE: 23 Oct 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2022 to 22 Oct 2022
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
DATE: 23 Oct 2021 to 30 Jun 2022
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
DATE: 30 Jul 2021 to 22 Oct 2021
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
DATE: 21 Oct 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
UNIVERSITY: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University

SPECIALTY: PEAP - R - Internal Medicine
DATE: 28 Jul 2020 to 20 Oct 2020
UNIVERSITY: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry: 24 Aug 2025
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 30 Jul 2021
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2021
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Sep 2020
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 28 Jul 2020
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 24 Aug 2025

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jul 2021

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2021

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Sep 2020

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Jul 2020