THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 04:33:08 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Dow Medical College, 2008
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: St. Michael's Hospital
30 Bond St
Toronto Ontario M5B 1W8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 360-4000
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurology
Effective: 28 Jul 2020
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Neurology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 28 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Pakistan

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Unity Health Toronto Toronto
HOSPITAL: Unity Health Toronto
LOCATION: Toronto

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Dow Medical College, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: St. Michael's Hospital
30 Bond St
Toronto Ontario M5B 1W8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 360-4000
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurology
Effective: 28 Jul 2020
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Neurology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 28 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Pakistan

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Unity Health Toronto Toronto
HOSPITAL: Unity Health Toronto
LOCATION: Toronto

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
14 Dec 2020
27 Jul 2027
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Dec 14 2020
EXPIRY DATE: Jul 27 2027
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. Atif Zafar may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Medicine,
Division of Neurology, University of Toronto, in which Dr. Zafar
holds an academic appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor,
and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from
the date of issuance or when Dr. Zafar no longer holds the academic
appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following
events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or
without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the College receives a report indicating that Dr. Zafar's clinical
performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional conduct, or
academic progress is unsatisfactory, or

(ii) the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a
report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. Zafar's certificate
of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment
report.


Note: This certificate is issued on July 28, 2020. In accordance with paragraphs 2 and 3 above,
this certificate will, if not extended by the Registration Committee, automatically expire on July 27, 2027.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. Atif Zafar may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Medicine,
Division of Neurology, University of Toronto, in which Dr. Zafar
holds an academic appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor,
and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from
the date of issuance or when Dr. Zafar no longer holds the academic
appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following
events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or
without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the College receives a report indicating that Dr. Zafar's clinical
performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional conduct, or
academic progress is unsatisfactory, or

(ii) the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a
report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. Zafar's certificate
of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment
report.


Note: This certificate is issued on July 28, 2020. In accordance with paragraphs 2 and 3 above,
this certificate will, if not extended by the Registration Committee, automatically expire on July 27, 2027.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Dow Medical College, 2008

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry: 27 Jul 2027
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 28 Jul 2020
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 27 Jul 2027

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Jul 2020
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 28 Jul 2020