THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
13/05/25 06:57:01 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Saskatchewan College of Medicine, 2017
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatric Emergency Medicine
Effective: 22 Sep 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Pediatrics
Effective: 08 Jun 2022
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatric Emergency Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 22 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 08 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Saskatchewan College of Medicine, 2017

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatric Emergency Medicine
Effective: 22 Sep 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Pediatrics
Effective: 08 Jun 2022
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatric Emergency Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 22 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 08 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Saskatchewan College of Medicine, 2017
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
PostGrad Yr 6 - Pediatric Emergency Medicine
01 Jul 2023 to 31 May 2024
University of Ottawa
PostGrad Yr 6 - Pediatric Emergency Medicine
01 Jul 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
University of Ottawa
PostGrad Yr 5 - Pediatric Emergency Medicine
01 Jul 2021 to 30 Jun 2022
University of Ottawa
EL - Pediatric Emergency Medicine
21 Sep 2020 to 04 Oct 2020
University of Ottawa
SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 6 - Pediatric Emergency Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2023 to 31 May 2024
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 6 - Pediatric Emergency Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 5 - Pediatric Emergency Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2021 to 30 Jun 2022
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: EL - Pediatric Emergency Medicine
DATE: 21 Sep 2020 to 04 Oct 2020
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 May 2024
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Oct 2023
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 06 Jul 2023
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 2022
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2021
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 04 Oct 2020
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Sep 2020
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 May 2024

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Oct 2023

DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 06 Jul 2023

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Jul 2022

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2021

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 04 Oct 2020

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Sep 2020