THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 04:34:54 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Universidad De La Sabana, 2009
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Universidad De La Sabana, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ADRIANA CAROLINA VARGAS NINO may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. VARGAS NINO is enrolled at University of Toronto;
(2) Dr. VARGAS NINO shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. VARGAS NINO is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. VARGAS NINO shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:
(i) When Dr. VARGAS NINO ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,
(ii) When Dr. VARGAS NINO ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or
(iii) When five years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.
NOTE: This certificate expires on 28 July, 2025.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ADRIANA CAROLINA VARGAS NINO may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. VARGAS NINO is enrolled at University of Toronto;
(2) Dr. VARGAS NINO shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. VARGAS NINO is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. VARGAS NINO shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:
(i) When Dr. VARGAS NINO ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,
(ii) When Dr. VARGAS NINO ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or
(iii) When five years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.
NOTE: This certificate expires on 28 July, 2025.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Universidad De La Sabana, 2009
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
Clinical Fellow - Pediatric Neurology
01 Jul 2025 to 28 Jul 2025
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Pediatric Neurology
25 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Pediatric Neurology
26 Jan 2023 to 10 Feb 2023
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Pediatric Neurology
01 Jul 2022 to 25 Jan 2023
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Pediatric Neurology
01 Jul 2021 to 30 Jun 2022
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Pediatric Neurology
03 Nov 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
University of Toronto
PEAP - CF - Pediatric Neurology
11 Aug 2020 to 02 Nov 2020
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Pediatric Neurology
DATE: 01 Jul 2025 to 28 Jul 2025
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Pediatric Neurology
DATE: 25 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Pediatric Neurology
DATE: 26 Jan 2023 to 10 Feb 2023
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Pediatric Neurology
DATE: 01 Jul 2022 to 25 Jan 2023
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Pediatric Neurology
DATE: 01 Jul 2021 to 30 Jun 2022
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Pediatric Neurology
DATE: 03 Nov 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PEAP - CF - Pediatric Neurology
DATE: 11 Aug 2020 to 02 Nov 2020
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry: 28 Jul 2025
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Jul 2024
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 10 Feb 2023
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Sep 2020
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 11 Aug 2020
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 28 Jul 2025

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Jul 2024

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 10 Feb 2023

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Sep 2020

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Aug 2020