THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
14/05/25 03:41:15 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Manipal Academy of Higher Education, 2010
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1200 Fourth Ave
St. Catharines General Hospital
Niagara Health
Department of Laboratory Medicine
St. Catharines ON L2S 0A9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-378-4647
Extension: 53353
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 50 College Dr
North Bay ON P1B 0A4
Phone: (705) 474-8600
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Pathology
Effective: 30 Jun 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Pathology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - New York

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North Bay Regional Health Centre North Bay
Niagara Health System - Welland Site Welland
Niagara Health System St Catharines General Site St Catharines
Niagara Health System Niagara Falls
HOSPITAL: North Bay Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: North Bay

HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System - Welland Site
LOCATION: Welland

HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System St Catharines General Site
LOCATION: St Catharines

HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System
LOCATION: Niagara Falls

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ankush Chander Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 13 May 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Chander (CPSO#: 122449 )
Business Address: 1200 Fourth Ave
St Catharines ON L2S 0A9
905-358-0171 Extn: 53378

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI
Medical School: Manipal Academy of Higher Education, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1200 Fourth Ave
St. Catharines General Hospital
Niagara Health
Department of Laboratory Medicine
St. Catharines ON L2S 0A9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-378-4647
Extension: 53353
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 50 College Dr
North Bay ON P1B 0A4
Phone: (705) 474-8600
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Pathology
Effective: 30 Jun 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Pathology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - New York

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North Bay Regional Health Centre North Bay
Niagara Health System - Welland Site Welland
Niagara Health System St Catharines General Site St Catharines
Niagara Health System Niagara Falls
HOSPITAL: North Bay Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: North Bay

HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System - Welland Site
LOCATION: Welland

HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System St Catharines General Site
LOCATION: St Catharines

HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System
LOCATION: Niagara Falls

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ankush Chander Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 13 May 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Chander (CPSO#: 122449 )
Business Address: 1200 Fourth Ave
St Catharines ON L2S 0A9
905-358-0171 Extn: 53378

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANKUSH CHANDER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHANDER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANKUSH CHANDER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHANDER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Manipal Academy of Higher Education, 2010

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Jul 2020
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 31 Jul 2020