THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 04:30:10 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: King Saud Bin Abdulaziz University, 2016
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2200 Eglinton Ave W
Mississauga Ontario L5M 2N1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 4062 Confederation Parkway
Mississauga Ontario L5B 0G4
Phone: (437) 917-9283
Fax: (905) 500-6504

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Apr 2024
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Apr 01 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: King Saud Bin Abdulaziz University, 2016

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2200 Eglinton Ave W
Mississauga Ontario L5M 2N1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 4062 Confederation Parkway
Mississauga Ontario L5B 0G4
Phone: (437) 917-9283
Fax: (905) 500-6504

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Apr 2024
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Apr 01 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MEAD ESAM A RUHAIYEM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RUHAIYEM is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MEAD ESAM A RUHAIYEM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RUHAIYEM is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: King Saud Bin Abdulaziz University, 2016

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Apr 2024
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Sep 2020
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 04 Aug 2020
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Apr 2024

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Sep 2020

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Aug 2020