THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
13/05/25 06:26:47 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Minnesota, 2007
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CHINESE

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Ottawa Hospital
General Campus
501 Smyth Rd
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 737-7777
Fax: No Information Available
Address: The Ottawa Hospital - Riverside Campus
1967 Riverside Dr
Ottawa ON K1H 7W9
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: The Ottawa Hospital
Civic Campus
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4E9
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Hematology
Effective: 05 Aug 2020
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Hematology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 05 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Ohio

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CHINESE
Medical School: University of Minnesota, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Ottawa Hospital
General Campus
501 Smyth Rd
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 737-7777
Fax: No Information Available
Address: The Ottawa Hospital - Riverside Campus
1967 Riverside Dr
Ottawa ON K1H 7W9
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: The Ottawa Hospital
Civic Campus
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4E9
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Hematology
Effective: 05 Aug 2020
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Hematology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 05 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Ohio

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
27 Jan 2022
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Jan 27 2022
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. TZU-FEI WANG may practise medicine independently in hematology.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. TZU-FEI WANG may practise medicine independently in hematology.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Minnesota, 2007

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 27 Jan 2022
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 20 Nov 2020
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 05 Aug 2020
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 27 Jan 2022

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 20 Nov 2020

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Aug 2020
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 05 Aug 2020