THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 03:25:40 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Puerto Rico, 2013
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, SPANISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 755 Queensway E
Unit 6&7
Cawthra Health Center
Mississauga ON L4Y 4C5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-896-9500
Fax: 647-777-6148

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 19 Aug 2020
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 19 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Email: [email protected]
Website: https://drhaddockpedspract.wixsite.com/2022

Date Received: 27 Sep 2022

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Rosa L. Haddock de Jesus Medical Practice Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 03 Oct 2022

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, SPANISH
Medical School: University of Puerto Rico, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 755 Queensway E
Unit 6&7
Cawthra Health Center
Mississauga ON L4Y 4C5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-896-9500
Fax: 647-777-6148

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 19 Aug 2020
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 19 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Email: [email protected]
Website: https://drhaddockpedspract.wixsite.com/2022

Date Received: 27 Sep 2022

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Rosa L. Haddock de Jesus Medical Practice Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 03 Oct 2022

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
08 Sep 2022
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Sep 08 2022
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. ROSA L. HADDOCK DE JESUS may practise medicine independently in pediatrics.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. ROSA L. HADDOCK DE JESUS may practise medicine independently in pediatrics.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Puerto Rico, 2013

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 08 Sep 2022
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 15 Jul 2022
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 27 Jan 2022
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 19 Aug 2020
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 08 Sep 2022

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 15 Jul 2022

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 27 Jan 2022

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Aug 2020
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 19 Aug 2020