THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
18/05/25 04:04:14 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2019
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Respirology
Effective: 30 Jun 2024
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Respirology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2019

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Respirology
Effective: 30 Jun 2024
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Respirology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2019
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
EL - Respirology
28 Aug 2023 to 24 Sep 2023
Western University
EL - Respirology
21 Sep 2020 to 18 Oct 2020
University of Ottawa
SPECIALTY: EL - Respirology
DATE: 28 Aug 2023 to 24 Sep 2023
UNIVERSITY: Western University

SPECIALTY: EL - Respirology
DATE: 21 Sep 2020 to 18 Oct 2020
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 24 Sep 2023
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 28 Aug 2023
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 18 Oct 2020
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Sep 2020
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 24 Sep 2023

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Aug 2023

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 18 Oct 2020

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Sep 2020