THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 03:48:06 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Umm Al-Qura University Faculty of Medicine, 2012
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 23 Sep 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 23 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Timmins and District Hospital Timmins
HOSPITAL: Timmins and District Hospital
LOCATION: Timmins

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Umm Al-Qura University Faculty of Medicine, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 23 Sep 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 23 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Timmins and District Hospital Timmins
HOSPITAL: Timmins and District Hospital
LOCATION: Timmins

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AMR ABDULWAHAB M TELMESANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TELMESANI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AMR ABDULWAHAB M TELMESANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TELMESANI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Umm Al-Qura University Faculty of Medicine, 2012

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Sep 2020
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Sep 2020