THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
10/05/25 05:21:33 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Université de Montréal Faculté de Médecine, 2018
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 555 Richmond Street West
Centre Francophone du Grand Toronto
Toronto Ontario M5V 3B1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-922-2672
Fax: No Information Available
Address: PO Box 909 Stn Main
Sioux Lookout Meno Ya Win Health Centre
Sioux Lookout ON P8T 1B4
Phone: (807) 737-3030
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Dec 2020
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 09 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Quebec

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Manitoulin Health Centre Little Current
Sioux Lookout Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre Sioux Lookout
Grey Bruce Health Services Owen Sound Owen Sound
Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare Huntsville District Memorial Hospital Huntsville
HOSPITAL: Manitoulin Health Centre
LOCATION: Little Current

HOSPITAL: Sioux Lookout Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre
LOCATION: Sioux Lookout

HOSPITAL: Grey Bruce Health Services Owen Sound
LOCATION: Owen Sound

HOSPITAL: Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare Huntsville District Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Huntsville

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: Université de Montréal Faculté de Médecine, 2018

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 555 Richmond Street West
Centre Francophone du Grand Toronto
Toronto Ontario M5V 3B1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-922-2672
Fax: No Information Available
Address: PO Box 909 Stn Main
Sioux Lookout Meno Ya Win Health Centre
Sioux Lookout ON P8T 1B4
Phone: (807) 737-3030
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Dec 2020
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 09 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Quebec

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Manitoulin Health Centre Little Current
Sioux Lookout Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre Sioux Lookout
Grey Bruce Health Services Owen Sound Owen Sound
Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare Huntsville District Memorial Hospital Huntsville
HOSPITAL: Manitoulin Health Centre
LOCATION: Little Current

HOSPITAL: Sioux Lookout Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre
LOCATION: Sioux Lookout

HOSPITAL: Grey Bruce Health Services Owen Sound
LOCATION: Owen Sound

HOSPITAL: Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare Huntsville District Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Huntsville

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ELANA ASHLEY LUKS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LUKS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ELANA ASHLEY LUKS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LUKS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Université de Montréal Faculté de Médecine, 2018

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Apr 2021
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Nov 2020
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Apr 2021

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Nov 2020