THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
09/05/25 04:36:15 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Universidad Nacional Autónoma de México Facultad de Medicina, 2009
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, SPANISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2075 Bayview Ave
Toronto ON M4N 3M5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 480-6100
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Medical Oncology
Effective: 07 Nov 2023
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Medical Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 07 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Mexico

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, SPANISH
Medical School: Universidad Nacional Autónoma de México Facultad de Medicina, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2075 Bayview Ave
Toronto ON M4N 3M5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 480-6100
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Medical Oncology
Effective: 07 Nov 2023
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Medical Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 07 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Mexico

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
07 Nov 2023
06 Nov 2030
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Nov 07 2023
EXPIRY DATE: Nov 06 2030
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. CARLOS AMIR CARMONA GONZALEZ may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Medicine, Division of Medical Oncology, University of Toronto, in which Dr. CARMONA GONZALEZ holds an academic appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from the date of issuance or when Dr. CARMONA GONZALEZ no longer holds the academic appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the College receives a report indicating that Dr. CARMONA GONZALEZ’s clinical performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or

(ii) the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. CARMONA GONZALEZ’s certificate of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment report.

Note: This certificate is issued on 07 November, 2023. In accordance with paragraphs 2 and 3 above, this certificate will, if not extended by the Registration Committee, automatically expire on 06 November, 2030.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. CARLOS AMIR CARMONA GONZALEZ may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Medicine, Division of Medical Oncology, University of Toronto, in which Dr. CARMONA GONZALEZ holds an academic appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from the date of issuance or when Dr. CARMONA GONZALEZ no longer holds the academic appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the College receives a report indicating that Dr. CARMONA GONZALEZ’s clinical performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or

(ii) the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. CARMONA GONZALEZ’s certificate of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment report.

Note: This certificate is issued on 07 November, 2023. In accordance with paragraphs 2 and 3 above, this certificate will, if not extended by the Registration Committee, automatically expire on 06 November, 2030.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Universidad Nacional Autónoma de México Facultad de Medicina, 2009

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 07 Nov 2023
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Sep 2020
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 10 Sep 2020
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 Nov 2023
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 07 Nov 2023
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration by Registration Committee.
Date: Expiry: 06 Nov 2030

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Sep 2020

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Sep 2020