THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 04:49:05 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: King George's Medical University, 2007
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: C H E O
Division of Neurosurgery
401 Smyth Rd
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 737-7600
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI
Medical School: King George's Medical University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: C H E O
Division of Neurosurgery
401 Smyth Rd
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 737-7600
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RAJESH KUMAR SHARMA may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. SHARMA is enrolled at Queen's University;
(2) Dr. SHARMA shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. SHARMA is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. SHARMA shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:
(i) When Dr. SHARMA ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,
(ii) When Dr. SHARMA ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or
(iii) When five years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 November, 2025.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RAJESH KUMAR SHARMA may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. SHARMA is enrolled at Queen's University;
(2) Dr. SHARMA shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. SHARMA is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. SHARMA shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:
(i) When Dr. SHARMA ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,
(ii) When Dr. SHARMA ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or
(iii) When five years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 November, 2025.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: King George's Medical University, 2007
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
Clinical Fellow - Neurosurgery
01 Jul 2025 to 30 Nov 2025
Queen's University
Clinical Fellow - Neurosurgery
01 Dec 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
Queen's University
Clinical Fellow - Neurosurgery
01 Jul 2024 to 30 Nov 2024
Queen's University
Clinical Fellow - Neurosurgery
01 Dec 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
Queen's University
Clinical Fellow - Neurosurgery
01 Jul 2023 to 30 Nov 2023
Queen's University
Clinical Fellow - Neurosurgery
01 Dec 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
Queen's University
Clinical Fellow - Neurosurgery
01 Jul 2022 to 30 Nov 2022
University of Ottawa
Clinical Fellow - Neurosurgery
01 Jul 2021 to 30 Jun 2022
University of Ottawa
Clinical Fellow - Neurosurgery
10 Nov 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
University of Ottawa
PEAP - CF - Neurosurgery
15 Sep 2020 to 09 Nov 2020
University of Ottawa
SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Neurosurgery
DATE: 01 Jul 2025 to 30 Nov 2025
UNIVERSITY: Queen's University

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Neurosurgery
DATE: 01 Dec 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY: Queen's University

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Neurosurgery
DATE: 01 Jul 2024 to 30 Nov 2024
UNIVERSITY: Queen's University

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Neurosurgery
DATE: 01 Dec 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
UNIVERSITY: Queen's University

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Neurosurgery
DATE: 01 Jul 2023 to 30 Nov 2023
UNIVERSITY: Queen's University

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Neurosurgery
DATE: 01 Dec 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
UNIVERSITY: Queen's University

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Neurosurgery
DATE: 01 Jul 2022 to 30 Nov 2022
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Neurosurgery
DATE: 01 Jul 2021 to 30 Jun 2022
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Neurosurgery
DATE: 10 Nov 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: PEAP - CF - Neurosurgery
DATE: 15 Sep 2020 to 09 Nov 2020
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry: 30 Nov 2025
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Dec 2022
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Sep 2020
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 15 Sep 2020
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 30 Nov 2025

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Dec 2022

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Sep 2020

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Sep 2020