THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 03:45:19 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland School of Medicine, 2006
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Patients seeking access to a copy or transfer of their medical record can contact St. Laurent Medical Clinic: 968 St. Laurent Blvd, ON., K1K 3B3, Telephone 613-789-4385.
Date Received: 02 Jun 2022

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: D R . W A E L B E R R O M E D I C I N E P R O F E S S I O N A L C O R P O R A T I O N
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 28 Aug 2022

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland School of Medicine, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Patients seeking access to a copy or transfer of their medical record can contact St. Laurent Medical Clinic: 968 St. Laurent Blvd, ON., K1K 3B3, Telephone 613-789-4385.
Date Received: 02 Jun 2022

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: D R . W A E L B E R R O M E D I C I N E P R O F E S S I O N A L C O R P O R A T I O N
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 28 Aug 2022

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Member
Effective Date: 25 Apr 2023
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Wael Berro to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective April 25, 2023:
 
College investigations were conducted into allegations of whether Dr. Berro engaged in professional misconduct and/ or sexual abuse of patients. During the investigations, Dr. Berro’s license to practice medicine in Ontario expired on June 30, 2022. Dr. Berro has agreed to never apply or reapply for registration as a physician in Ontario.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Member
Effective Date: 25 Apr 2023
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Wael Berro to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective April 25, 2023:
 
College investigations were conducted into allegations of whether Dr. Berro engaged in professional misconduct and/ or sexual abuse of patients. During the investigations, Dr. Berro’s license to practice medicine in Ontario expired on June 30, 2022. Dr. Berro has agreed to never apply or reapply for registration as a physician in Ontario.

Training

Medical School: Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland School of Medicine, 2006

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2022
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 21 Apr 2022
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 05 Nov 2020
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 04 Nov 2020
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2022

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 21 Apr 2022

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Nov 2020
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 05 Nov 2020

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Nov 2020
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 04 Nov 2020