THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
20/05/25 04:26:15 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: King Abdulaziz University College of Medicine, 2010
Gender: No Information Available
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: McMaster University Medical Centre
1200 Main St W
Hamilton ON L8N 3Z5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences General Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: No Information Available
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: King Abdulaziz University College of Medicine, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: McMaster University Medical Centre
1200 Main St W
Hamilton ON L8N 3Z5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences General Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. FAISAL HASSAN A MRAIR shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. MRAIR is enrolled at McMaster University;
(2) Dr. MRAIR shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. MRAIR is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. MRAIR shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. MRAIR is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. MRAIR no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2025.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. FAISAL HASSAN A MRAIR shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. MRAIR is enrolled at McMaster University;
(2) Dr. MRAIR shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. MRAIR is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. MRAIR shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. MRAIR is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. MRAIR no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2025.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: King Abdulaziz University College of Medicine, 2010
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic and Molecular Pathology
01 Jul 2025 to 08 Mar 2026
McMaster University
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic and Molecular Pathology
10 Mar 2025 to 30 Jun 2025
McMaster University
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic and Molecular Pathology
01 Jul 2024 to 09 Mar 2025
McMaster University
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anatomical Pathology
09 Mar 2024 to 30 Jun 2024
McMaster University
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anatomical Pathology
01 Jul 2023 to 08 Mar 2024
McMaster University
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anatomical Pathology
09 Mar 2023 to 30 Jun 2023
McMaster University
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anatomical Pathology
01 Jul 2022 to 08 Mar 2023
McMaster University
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anatomical Pathology
09 Mar 2022 to 30 Jun 2022
McMaster University
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anatomical Pathology
01 Jul 2021 to 08 Mar 2022
McMaster University
Resident 1 - Anatomical Pathology
09 Mar 2021 to 30 Jun 2021
McMaster University
PEAP - R - Anatomical Pathology
09 Feb 2021 to 08 Mar 2021
McMaster University
SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic and Molecular Pathology
DATE: 01 Jul 2025 to 08 Mar 2026
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic and Molecular Pathology
DATE: 10 Mar 2025 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic and Molecular Pathology
DATE: 01 Jul 2024 to 09 Mar 2025
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 4 - Anatomical Pathology
DATE: 09 Mar 2024 to 30 Jun 2024
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 3 - Anatomical Pathology
DATE: 01 Jul 2023 to 08 Mar 2024
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 3 - Anatomical Pathology
DATE: 09 Mar 2023 to 30 Jun 2023
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 2 - Anatomical Pathology
DATE: 01 Jul 2022 to 08 Mar 2023
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 2 - Anatomical Pathology
DATE: 09 Mar 2022 to 30 Jun 2022
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 1 - Anatomical Pathology
DATE: 01 Jul 2021 to 08 Mar 2022
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: Resident 1 - Anatomical Pathology
DATE: 09 Mar 2021 to 30 Jun 2021
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: PEAP - R - Anatomical Pathology
DATE: 09 Feb 2021 to 08 Mar 2021
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry: 30 Jun 2025
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Feb 2021
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 30 Jun 2025

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Feb 2021