THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
26/05/25 04:16:47 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Islamic University of Gaza, 2012
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC
Medical School: Islamic University of Gaza, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Islamic University of Gaza, 2012
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine
01 Jul 2023 to 16 Feb 2024
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine
01 Jul 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine
17 Jan 2022 to 30 Jun 2022
University of Toronto
PEAP - CF - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine
25 Oct 2021 to 16 Jan 2022
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2023 to 16 Feb 2024
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine
DATE: 17 Jan 2022 to 30 Jun 2022
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PEAP - CF - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine
DATE: 25 Oct 2021 to 16 Jan 2022
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 16 Feb 2024
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Oct 2021
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 16 Feb 2024

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Oct 2021