THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 04:03:34 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Kirksville College of Osteopathic Medici, 2015
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 800 Commissioners Rd E
London Health Sciences Centre
London ON N6A 5W9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Emergency Medicine
Effective: 23 Oct 2020
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Emergency Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 23 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - New York

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Health Care, London London
London Health Sciences Centre London
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care, London
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Kirksville College of Osteopathic Medici, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 800 Commissioners Rd E
London Health Sciences Centre
London ON N6A 5W9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Emergency Medicine
Effective: 23 Oct 2020
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Emergency Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 23 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - New York

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Health Care, London London
London Health Sciences Centre London
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care, London
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
27 Jan 2022
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Jan 27 2022
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. KRISTIN ERIKA LYTHGOE may practise medicine independently in emergency medicine.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. KRISTIN ERIKA LYTHGOE may practise medicine independently in emergency medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Kirksville College of Osteopathic Medici, 2015

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 27 Jan 2022
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 23 Oct 2020
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 27 Jan 2022

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Oct 2020
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 23 Oct 2020