THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
21/05/25 02:22:43 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Antioquia, 2011
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Antioquia, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. EMMANUEL SALINAS MIRANDA may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. SALINAS MIRANDA is enrolled at University of Ottawa;
(2) Dr. SALINAS MIRANDA shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. SALINAS MIRANDA is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. SALINAS MIRANDA shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:
(i) When Dr. SALINAS MIRANDA ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,
(ii) When Dr. SALINAS MIRANDA ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or
(iii) When five years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2025.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. EMMANUEL SALINAS MIRANDA may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. SALINAS MIRANDA is enrolled at University of Ottawa;
(2) Dr. SALINAS MIRANDA shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. SALINAS MIRANDA is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. SALINAS MIRANDA shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:
(i) When Dr. SALINAS MIRANDA ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,
(ii) When Dr. SALINAS MIRANDA ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or
(iii) When five years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2025.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Antioquia, 2011
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology
01 Jan 2025 to 30 Jun 2025
University of Ottawa
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology
20 Nov 2024 to 31 Dec 2024
University of Ottawa
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology
01 Jul 2024 to 31 Oct 2024
University of Ottawa
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology
01 Jul 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
University of Ottawa
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology
23 Sep 2021 to 30 Jun 2022
University of Toronto
PEAP - CF - Diagnostic Radiology
01 Jul 2021 to 22 Sep 2021
University of Toronto
Other - Diagnostic Radiology
01 Jan 2019 to 30 Jun 2021
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology
DATE: 01 Jan 2025 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology
DATE: 20 Nov 2024 to 31 Dec 2024
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology
DATE: 01 Jul 2024 to 31 Oct 2024
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology
DATE: 01 Jul 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology
DATE: 23 Sep 2021 to 30 Jun 2022
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PEAP - CF - Diagnostic Radiology
DATE: 01 Jul 2021 to 22 Sep 2021
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Other - Diagnostic Radiology
DATE: 01 Jan 2019 to 30 Jun 2021
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry: 30 Jun 2025
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Nov 2024
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Oct 2024
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2023
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2022
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2021
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 30 Jun 2025

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Nov 2024

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Oct 2024

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2023

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2022

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2021