THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 03:18:13 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: American University of the Caribbean, 2017
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 435 The Boardwalk
Waterloo Rheumatology
Suite 208
Waterloo Ontario N2T 0C2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5198049584
Fax: 5192081052

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Rheumatology
Effective: 30 Jun 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2022
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Rheumatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: American University of the Caribbean, 2017

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 435 The Boardwalk
Waterloo Rheumatology
Suite 208
Waterloo Ontario N2T 0C2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5198049584
Fax: 5192081052

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Rheumatology
Effective: 30 Jun 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2022
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Rheumatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MICHAEL JAMES VERNON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VERNON is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MICHAEL JAMES VERNON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VERNON is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: American University of the Caribbean, 2017

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Mar 2023
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2021
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Mar 2023

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2021