THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:53:04 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Saba University School of Medicine, 2014
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 481 Bloor Street West
Second Floor
Toronto Ontario M5S 1X9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-928-0217
Fax: 416-964-1815

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 21 Dec 2020
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 21 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Michigan

Other Health and Non-Health Professions

PROFESSION JURISDICTION
Teaching Canada - Ontario
PROFESSION: Teaching
JURISDICTION: Canada - Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Saba University School of Medicine, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 481 Bloor Street West
Second Floor
Toronto Ontario M5S 1X9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-928-0217
Fax: 416-964-1815

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 21 Dec 2020
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 21 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Michigan

Other Health and Non-Health Professions

PROFESSION JURISDICTION
Teaching Canada - Ontario
PROFESSION: Teaching
JURISDICTION: Canada - Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Member
25 Nov 2024
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Member
EFFECTIVE DATE: Nov 25 2024
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1 of 2)

As from November 25th, 2024, the following are imposed as terms, conditions and limitations on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Ajeet Singh Sidhu in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Sidhu to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT
(“Undertaking”)

of

DR. AJEET SINGH SIDHU
(“Dr. Sidhu”)

to

COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
(the “College”)
________________________________________

A. PREAMBLE

(1) In this Undertaking:
“Code” means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2 to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as amended;
“Discipline Tribunal” means the Ontario Physicians and Surgeons Discipline Tribunal of the College;
“ICR Committee” means Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee of the College;
“Intimate examinations” means breast, pelvic, genital, perineal, perianal and rectal examinations;
“OHIP” means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan;
“Ontario Physicians and Surgeons Discipline Tribunal” means the Discipline Committee established under the Code;
“Practice Location” or “Practice Locations” means each and every location at which Dr. Sidhu, practices, delegates, or has privileges, including, but not limited to, any hospitals, clinics, offices, and any Out-of-Hospital Premises and Independent Health Facilities with which he is affiliated, in any jurisdiction;
“Public Register” means the College’s register that is available to the public.

(2) I, Dr. Sidhu, certificate of registration number 123011, am a member of the College.

(3) I, Dr. Sidhu, acknowledge that the College has referred to the Discipline Tribunal, in the matter of College File Number CAS-475646-Z6S1C4, allegations that I committed an act of professional misconduct:

(a) under clause 51(1)(b) of the Code in that the governing body of another health profession in Ontario, or the governing body of a health profession in a jurisdiction other than Ontario, has found that I, Dr. Sidhu, committed an act of professional misconduct that would, in the opinion of the panel, be an act of professional misconduct under section 51 of the Code or an act of professional misconduct as defined in the regulations;
(b) under subsection 1(3) of Ontario Regulation 856/93 made under the Medicine Act, 1991 (“O. Reg. 856/93”), the governing body of a health profession in a jurisdiction other than Ontario has made a finding of incompetence or professional misconduct or a similar finding against me, and the finding is based on facts which would, in the opinion of the College, be grounds for a finding of incompetence as defined in section 52 of the Code or would be an act of professional misconduct as defined in subsection (1); and
(c) under subsection 1(4) of O. Reg. 856/93, in that the governing body of a health profession in a jurisdiction other than Ontario has provided records to the College evidencing that an allegation of professional misconduct or incompetence or a similar allegation has been made against me and I, Dr. Sidhu, have entered into an agreement or compromise with the governing body in order to settle the matter without a finding of misconduct or incompetence or a similar finding being made; the College is satisfied that the records are authentic, accurate and complete; and the act or omission that is the subject of the allegation would, in the opinion of the College, be an act of professional misconduct as defined in subsection (1), or would constitute incompetence as defined in section 52 of the Code.

(4) I, Dr. Sidhu, have read the Notice of Hearing dated October 28, 2024, which sets out the allegations against me. I am aware of the College’s concern about protecting the public and I understand the nature of the allegations against me.

(5) I, Dr. Sidhu, acknowledge that the College has accepted this Undertaking in lieu of making an Order under section 25.4 of the Code at this time.

(6) I, Dr. Sidhu, acknowledge that this Undertaking does not preclude the ICR Committee from making an order at a later date in accordance with the Code.

(7) I, Dr. Sidhu, acknowledge that this Undertaking continues in force until the matters currently referred are disposed of by a panel of the Discipline Tribunal.

B. UNDERTAKING

(8) I, Dr. Sidhu, undertake to abide by the provisions of this Undertaking, effective five days from the date this Undertaking is signed (“Effective Date”).

(9) Practice Restrictions

(a) I, Dr. Sidhu, undertake that I shall not communicate with patients outside of in-person encounters at my Practice Locations, unless such communication complies with the College’s Virtual Care Policy.
(b) I, Dr. Sidhu, undertake that I shall not perform intimate examinations on any patient, in any jurisdiction.
(10) I, Dr. Sidhu, undertake to inform the College of each and every one of my Practice Locations within five (5) days of executing this Undertaking. Going forward, I further undertake to inform the College of any and all new Practice Locations within five (5) days of commencing practice at that location.

(11) Posting a Sign

(a) I, Dr. Sidhu, undertake that, effective immediately, I shall post a sign in all waiting rooms, examination rooms and consulting rooms, in all of my Practice Locations, in a clearly visible and secure location, at all times whether or not I am physically present at the Practice Location, in the form set out in Appendix “A”. If providing care in a virtual setting, I shall display the sign to the patient at the outset of the patient encounter. If the patient encounter is by telephone, I shall read the sign to the patient at the outset of the patient encounter. For further clarity, the sign shall state as follows:
“Dr. Sidhu shall not communicate with patients outside of in-person encounters at his Practice Locations, unless such communication complies with the College’s Virtual Care Policy.
Dr. Sidhu must not perform any intimate examinations (breast, pelvic, genital, perineal, perianal and rectal) on any patient, in any jurisdiction.
Further information may be found on the College website at www.cpso.on.ca.”
(b) I, Dr. Sidhu, undertake to post a certified translation in any language in which I provide services, of the sign described in section (11)(a), in all waiting rooms, examination rooms and consulting rooms, in all of my Practice Locations, in a clearly visible and secure location, in the form set out at Appendix “A.”
(c) I, Dr. Sidhu, undertake to provide the certified translation described in section (11)(b), to the College within thirty (30) days of executing this Undertaking.
(d) I, Dr. Sidhu, undertake that if I elect, after the execution of this Undertaking, to provide services in any other language, I will notify the College prior to providing any such services.
(e) I, Dr. Sidhu, undertake to provide to the College the certified translation described in section (11)(b) prior to providing services in any language described in section (11)(d).

C. ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

(12) I, Dr. Sidhu, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely responsible for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc. arising from the implementation of any of the provisions of this Undertaking.
(13) I, Dr. Sidhu, acknowledge that the College will provide this Undertaking to any chief of staff, or a colleague with similar responsibilities, at any Practice Location (“Chief of Staff” or “Chiefs of Staff”).
(14) I, Dr. Sidhu, acknowledge that a breach of any provision of this Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and may result in a referral of specified allegations to the Discipline Tribunal.
(15) I, Dr. Sidhu, acknowledge that I have read and understand the provisions of this Undertaking, and that I have obtained independent legal counsel in reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my right to do so.
(16) I, Dr. Sidhu, acknowledge that, in the event of an appeal of any Order of the Discipline Tribunal, if the Discipline Tribunal has directed the Registrar to revoke, suspend, or impose terms and conditions on my certificate of registration, that Order will take effect immediately despite any appeal.
(17) I, Dr. Sidhu, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred to in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.
(18) I, Dr. Sidhu, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms, conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the purposes of section 23 of the Code.

(19) Public Register

(a) I, Dr. Sidhu, acknowledge that, during the time period that this Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be posted on the Public Register.
(b) I, Dr. Sidhu, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking being posted in accordance with section (19)(a) above, the following summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the time period that this Undertaking remains in effect:
Dr. Sidhu is the subject of a referral to the Discipline Tribunal into allegations of professional misconduct and/or incompetence in relation to findings made by, and/or agreements with, a governing body of a health profession in a jurisdiction other than Ontario. As a result of the referral:
Dr. Sidhu must not communicate with patients outside of in-person encounters at his Practice Locations, unless such communication complies with the College’s Virtual Care Policy.
Dr. Sidhu must not perform any intimate examinations (breast, pelvic, genital, perineal, perianal and rectal) on any patient, in any jurisdiction.
Dr. Sidhu shall post a sign in all waiting rooms, examination rooms and consulting rooms, in all Practice Locations, in a clearly visible and secure location, that states:
“Dr. Sidhu shall not communicate with patients outside of in-person encounters at his Practice Locations, unless such communication complies with the College’s Virtual Care Policy.
Dr. Sidhu must not perform any intimate examinations (breast, pelvic, genital, perineal, perianal and rectal) on any patient, in any jurisdiction.
Further information may be found on the College website at www.cpso.on.ca.”

D. CONSENT

(20) I, Dr. Sidhu, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make appropriate enquiries of OHIP and/or any person who or institution that may have relevant information, in order for the College to monitor my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.

(21) I, Dr. Sidhu, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP consent form, attached hereto as Appendix “B”.

(22) I, Dr. Sidhu, consent to submit to, and not interfere with, unannounced inspections of my Practice Locations and patient records by the College and to any other activity the College deems necessary in order to monitor my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.

(23) I, Dr. Sidhu, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide all Chiefs of Staff with any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.

(24) I, Dr. Sidhu, give my irrevocable consent to all Chiefs of Staff to disclose to the College, and to one another, any information relevant to this Undertaking and/or relevant for the purposes of monitoring my compliance with this Undertaking.

(2 of 2)
Dr. AJEET SINGH SIDHU may practise medicine independently in Family Medicine.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1 of 2)

As from November 25th, 2024, the following are imposed as terms, conditions and limitations on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Ajeet Singh Sidhu in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Sidhu to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT
(“Undertaking”)

of

DR. AJEET SINGH SIDHU
(“Dr. Sidhu”)

to

COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
(the “College”)
________________________________________

A. PREAMBLE

(1) In this Undertaking:
“Code” means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2 to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as amended;
“Discipline Tribunal” means the Ontario Physicians and Surgeons Discipline Tribunal of the College;
“ICR Committee” means Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee of the College;
“Intimate examinations” means breast, pelvic, genital, perineal, perianal and rectal examinations;
“OHIP” means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan;
“Ontario Physicians and Surgeons Discipline Tribunal” means the Discipline Committee established under the Code;
“Practice Location” or “Practice Locations” means each and every location at which Dr. Sidhu, practices, delegates, or has privileges, including, but not limited to, any hospitals, clinics, offices, and any Out-of-Hospital Premises and Independent Health Facilities with which he is affiliated, in any jurisdiction;
“Public Register” means the College’s register that is available to the public.

(2) I, Dr. Sidhu, certificate of registration number 123011, am a member of the College.

(3) I, Dr. Sidhu, acknowledge that the College has referred to the Discipline Tribunal, in the matter of College File Number CAS-475646-Z6S1C4, allegations that I committed an act of professional misconduct:

(a) under clause 51(1)(b) of the Code in that the governing body of another health profession in Ontario, or the governing body of a health profession in a jurisdiction other than Ontario, has found that I, Dr. Sidhu, committed an act of professional misconduct that would, in the opinion of the panel, be an act of professional misconduct under section 51 of the Code or an act of professional misconduct as defined in the regulations;
(b) under subsection 1(3) of Ontario Regulation 856/93 made under the Medicine Act, 1991 (“O. Reg. 856/93”), the governing body of a health profession in a jurisdiction other than Ontario has made a finding of incompetence or professional misconduct or a similar finding against me, and the finding is based on facts which would, in the opinion of the College, be grounds for a finding of incompetence as defined in section 52 of the Code or would be an act of professional misconduct as defined in subsection (1); and
(c) under subsection 1(4) of O. Reg. 856/93, in that the governing body of a health profession in a jurisdiction other than Ontario has provided records to the College evidencing that an allegation of professional misconduct or incompetence or a similar allegation has been made against me and I, Dr. Sidhu, have entered into an agreement or compromise with the governing body in order to settle the matter without a finding of misconduct or incompetence or a similar finding being made; the College is satisfied that the records are authentic, accurate and complete; and the act or omission that is the subject of the allegation would, in the opinion of the College, be an act of professional misconduct as defined in subsection (1), or would constitute incompetence as defined in section 52 of the Code.

(4) I, Dr. Sidhu, have read the Notice of Hearing dated October 28, 2024, which sets out the allegations against me. I am aware of the College’s concern about protecting the public and I understand the nature of the allegations against me.

(5) I, Dr. Sidhu, acknowledge that the College has accepted this Undertaking in lieu of making an Order under section 25.4 of the Code at this time.

(6) I, Dr. Sidhu, acknowledge that this Undertaking does not preclude the ICR Committee from making an order at a later date in accordance with the Code.

(7) I, Dr. Sidhu, acknowledge that this Undertaking continues in force until the matters currently referred are disposed of by a panel of the Discipline Tribunal.

B. UNDERTAKING

(8) I, Dr. Sidhu, undertake to abide by the provisions of this Undertaking, effective five days from the date this Undertaking is signed (“Effective Date”).

(9) Practice Restrictions

(a) I, Dr. Sidhu, undertake that I shall not communicate with patients outside of in-person encounters at my Practice Locations, unless such communication complies with the College’s Virtual Care Policy.
(b) I, Dr. Sidhu, undertake that I shall not perform intimate examinations on any patient, in any jurisdiction.
(10) I, Dr. Sidhu, undertake to inform the College of each and every one of my Practice Locations within five (5) days of executing this Undertaking. Going forward, I further undertake to inform the College of any and all new Practice Locations within five (5) days of commencing practice at that location.

(11) Posting a Sign

(a) I, Dr. Sidhu, undertake that, effective immediately, I shall post a sign in all waiting rooms, examination rooms and consulting rooms, in all of my Practice Locations, in a clearly visible and secure location, at all times whether or not I am physically present at the Practice Location, in the form set out in Appendix “A”. If providing care in a virtual setting, I shall display the sign to the patient at the outset of the patient encounter. If the patient encounter is by telephone, I shall read the sign to the patient at the outset of the patient encounter. For further clarity, the sign shall state as follows:
“Dr. Sidhu shall not communicate with patients outside of in-person encounters at his Practice Locations, unless such communication complies with the College’s Virtual Care Policy.
Dr. Sidhu must not perform any intimate examinations (breast, pelvic, genital, perineal, perianal and rectal) on any patient, in any jurisdiction.
Further information may be found on the College website at www.cpso.on.ca.”
(b) I, Dr. Sidhu, undertake to post a certified translation in any language in which I provide services, of the sign described in section (11)(a), in all waiting rooms, examination rooms and consulting rooms, in all of my Practice Locations, in a clearly visible and secure location, in the form set out at Appendix “A.”
(c) I, Dr. Sidhu, undertake to provide the certified translation described in section (11)(b), to the College within thirty (30) days of executing this Undertaking.
(d) I, Dr. Sidhu, undertake that if I elect, after the execution of this Undertaking, to provide services in any other language, I will notify the College prior to providing any such services.
(e) I, Dr. Sidhu, undertake to provide to the College the certified translation described in section (11)(b) prior to providing services in any language described in section (11)(d).

C. ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

(12) I, Dr. Sidhu, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely responsible for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc. arising from the implementation of any of the provisions of this Undertaking.
(13) I, Dr. Sidhu, acknowledge that the College will provide this Undertaking to any chief of staff, or a colleague with similar responsibilities, at any Practice Location (“Chief of Staff” or “Chiefs of Staff”).
(14) I, Dr. Sidhu, acknowledge that a breach of any provision of this Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and may result in a referral of specified allegations to the Discipline Tribunal.
(15) I, Dr. Sidhu, acknowledge that I have read and understand the provisions of this Undertaking, and that I have obtained independent legal counsel in reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my right to do so.
(16) I, Dr. Sidhu, acknowledge that, in the event of an appeal of any Order of the Discipline Tribunal, if the Discipline Tribunal has directed the Registrar to revoke, suspend, or impose terms and conditions on my certificate of registration, that Order will take effect immediately despite any appeal.
(17) I, Dr. Sidhu, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred to in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.
(18) I, Dr. Sidhu, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms, conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the purposes of section 23 of the Code.

(19) Public Register

(a) I, Dr. Sidhu, acknowledge that, during the time period that this Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be posted on the Public Register.
(b) I, Dr. Sidhu, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking being posted in accordance with section (19)(a) above, the following summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the time period that this Undertaking remains in effect:
Dr. Sidhu is the subject of a referral to the Discipline Tribunal into allegations of professional misconduct and/or incompetence in relation to findings made by, and/or agreements with, a governing body of a health profession in a jurisdiction other than Ontario. As a result of the referral:
Dr. Sidhu must not communicate with patients outside of in-person encounters at his Practice Locations, unless such communication complies with the College’s Virtual Care Policy.
Dr. Sidhu must not perform any intimate examinations (breast, pelvic, genital, perineal, perianal and rectal) on any patient, in any jurisdiction.
Dr. Sidhu shall post a sign in all waiting rooms, examination rooms and consulting rooms, in all Practice Locations, in a clearly visible and secure location, that states:
“Dr. Sidhu shall not communicate with patients outside of in-person encounters at his Practice Locations, unless such communication complies with the College’s Virtual Care Policy.
Dr. Sidhu must not perform any intimate examinations (breast, pelvic, genital, perineal, perianal and rectal) on any patient, in any jurisdiction.
Further information may be found on the College website at www.cpso.on.ca.”

D. CONSENT

(20) I, Dr. Sidhu, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make appropriate enquiries of OHIP and/or any person who or institution that may have relevant information, in order for the College to monitor my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.

(21) I, Dr. Sidhu, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP consent form, attached hereto as Appendix “B”.

(22) I, Dr. Sidhu, consent to submit to, and not interfere with, unannounced inspections of my Practice Locations and patient records by the College and to any other activity the College deems necessary in order to monitor my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.

(23) I, Dr. Sidhu, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide all Chiefs of Staff with any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.

(24) I, Dr. Sidhu, give my irrevocable consent to all Chiefs of Staff to disclose to the College, and to one another, any information relevant to this Undertaking and/or relevant for the purposes of monitoring my compliance with this Undertaking.

(2 of 2)
Dr. AJEET SINGH SIDHU may practise medicine independently in Family Medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings (1)

Date of Referral or Application: 28 Oct 2024
Hearing Date(s): Merits; May 6, 2025
For more details please visit the OPSDT website

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (3)

Source: Member
Effective Date: 25 Nov 2024
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Ajeet Singh Sidhu to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective November 25th, 2024:
 
Dr. Sidhu is the subject of a referral to the Discipline Tribunal into allegations of professional misconduct and/or incompetence in relation to findings made by, and/or agreements with, a governing body of a health profession in a jurisdiction other than Ontario. As a result of the referral:

Dr. Sidhu must not communicate with patients outside of in-person encounters at his Practice Locations, unless such communication complies with the College’s Virtual Care Policy.

Dr. Sidhu must not perform any intimate examinations (breast, pelvic, genital, perineal, perianal and rectal) on any patient, in any jurisdiction.

Dr. Sidhu shall post a sign in all waiting rooms, examination rooms and consulting rooms, in all Practice Locations, in a clearly visible and secure location, that states:

“Dr. Sidhu shall not communicate with patients outside of in-person encounters at his Practice Locations, unless such communication complies with the College’s Virtual Care Policy.
Dr. Sidhu must not perform any intimate examinations (breast, pelvic, genital, perineal, perianal and rectal) on any patient, in any jurisdiction.

Further information may be found on the College website at www.cpso.on.ca.”


Source: FSMB (USA)
Notice Type: External Findings - Other Regulatory Body
Effective Date: 20 Nov 2024
Summary:
On November 20, 2024, the Disciplinary Subcommittee of the Michigan Board of Medicine found that Dr. Sidhu  had violated the Michigan Public Health Code as a result of the final adverse administrative action taken by the Medical Board of California (a decision  on October 10, 2023 which adopted a Stipulated Surrender of License and Order that resulted in Dr. Sidhu surrendering his physician and surgeon license in California).  Pursuant to a Consent Order with Dr. Sidhu, the Michigan Disciplinary Subcommittee ordered Dr. Sidhu to pay a fine of $250 and that Dr. Sidhu’s license to practice medicine be limited such that (a) Dr. Sidhu shall not engage in the practice of medicine in Michigan until he provides written documentation from the Medical Board of California verifying that he has fully complied with the terms of discipline imposed by the California Board’s Decision, and that Dr. Sidhu holds a full and unencumbered license to practice medicine in California, and (b) Dr. Sidhu shall  report to the Michigan Department  any change in the status of his California license within 30 days of such change.  The College was notified of this finding by a report from FSMB dated December 9, 2024.


Source: Member
Notice Type: External Findings - Other Regulatory Body
Effective Date: 17 Oct 2023
Summary:
The Medical Board of California issued an Order effective October 17, 2023, accepting Dr. Sidhu’s surrender of his license to practice medicine in California in lieu of further disciplinary proceedings. The Order states that this constitutes the imposition of discipline against Dr. Sidhu.   This Order was made in the context of an Accusation made by the Board alleging sexual misconduct with a patient. The College was notified of this action by Dr. Sidhu on October 17, 2023.

Current Tribunal Proceedings (1)

Date of Referral or Application: 28 Oct 2024
Hearing Date(s): Merits; May 6, 2025
For more details please visit the OPSDT website

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (3)

Source: Member
Effective Date: 25 Nov 2024
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Ajeet Singh Sidhu to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective November 25th, 2024:
 
Dr. Sidhu is the subject of a referral to the Discipline Tribunal into allegations of professional misconduct and/or incompetence in relation to findings made by, and/or agreements with, a governing body of a health profession in a jurisdiction other than Ontario. As a result of the referral:

Dr. Sidhu must not communicate with patients outside of in-person encounters at his Practice Locations, unless such communication complies with the College’s Virtual Care Policy.

Dr. Sidhu must not perform any intimate examinations (breast, pelvic, genital, perineal, perianal and rectal) on any patient, in any jurisdiction.

Dr. Sidhu shall post a sign in all waiting rooms, examination rooms and consulting rooms, in all Practice Locations, in a clearly visible and secure location, that states:

“Dr. Sidhu shall not communicate with patients outside of in-person encounters at his Practice Locations, unless such communication complies with the College’s Virtual Care Policy.
Dr. Sidhu must not perform any intimate examinations (breast, pelvic, genital, perineal, perianal and rectal) on any patient, in any jurisdiction.

Further information may be found on the College website at www.cpso.on.ca.”


Source: FSMB (USA)
Notice Type: External Findings - Other Regulatory Body
Effective Date: 20 Nov 2024
Summary:
On November 20, 2024, the Disciplinary Subcommittee of the Michigan Board of Medicine found that Dr. Sidhu  had violated the Michigan Public Health Code as a result of the final adverse administrative action taken by the Medical Board of California (a decision  on October 10, 2023 which adopted a Stipulated Surrender of License and Order that resulted in Dr. Sidhu surrendering his physician and surgeon license in California).  Pursuant to a Consent Order with Dr. Sidhu, the Michigan Disciplinary Subcommittee ordered Dr. Sidhu to pay a fine of $250 and that Dr. Sidhu’s license to practice medicine be limited such that (a) Dr. Sidhu shall not engage in the practice of medicine in Michigan until he provides written documentation from the Medical Board of California verifying that he has fully complied with the terms of discipline imposed by the California Board’s Decision, and that Dr. Sidhu holds a full and unencumbered license to practice medicine in California, and (b) Dr. Sidhu shall  report to the Michigan Department  any change in the status of his California license within 30 days of such change.  The College was notified of this finding by a report from FSMB dated December 9, 2024.


Source: Member
Notice Type: External Findings - Other Regulatory Body
Effective Date: 17 Oct 2023
Summary:
The Medical Board of California issued an Order effective October 17, 2023, accepting Dr. Sidhu’s surrender of his license to practice medicine in California in lieu of further disciplinary proceedings. The Order states that this constitutes the imposition of discipline against Dr. Sidhu.   This Order was made in the context of an Accusation made by the Board alleging sexual misconduct with a patient. The College was notified of this action by Dr. Sidhu on October 17, 2023.

Training

Medical School: Saba University School of Medicine, 2014

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Member. Effective: 25 Nov 2024
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 26 May 2022
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 21 Dec 2020
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Member.
Date: Effective: 25 Nov 2024

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 26 May 2022

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Dec 2020
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 21 Dec 2020