THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:12:08 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Pretoria School of Medicine, 2008
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Pretoria School of Medicine, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Pretoria School of Medicine, 2008
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology
01 Jul 2022 to 12 Nov 2022
McMaster University
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology
13 Nov 2021 to 30 Jun 2022
McMaster University
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology
01 Jul 2021 to 12 Nov 2021
McMaster University
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology
01 Feb 2021 to 30 Jun 2021
McMaster University
PEAP - CF - Cardiology
13 Nov 2020 to 31 Jan 2021
McMaster University
SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Cardiology
DATE: 01 Jul 2022 to 12 Nov 2022
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Cardiology
DATE: 13 Nov 2021 to 30 Jun 2022
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Cardiology
DATE: 01 Jul 2021 to 12 Nov 2021
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Cardiology
DATE: 01 Feb 2021 to 30 Jun 2021
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: PEAP - CF - Cardiology
DATE: 13 Nov 2020 to 31 Jan 2021
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 12 Nov 2022
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Nov 2020
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 12 Nov 2022

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Nov 2020