THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 03:36:09 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Rome, 2012
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 01 Jan 2024
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 01 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Rome, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 01 Jan 2024
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 01 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
01 Jan 2024
31 Dec 2030
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Jan 01 2024
EXPIRY DATE: Dec 31 2030
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. BENEDETTA GIAMMARIOLI may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Anesthesiology and Pain Medicine, University of Toronto, in which Dr. GIAMMARIOLI holds an academic appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of her academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from the date of issuance or when Dr. GIAMMARIOLI no longer holds the academic appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the College receives a report indicating that Dr. GIAMMARIOLI’s clinical performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or

(ii) the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. GIAMMARIOLI’s certificate of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment report.

Note: This certificate is issued on 01 January, 2024. In accordance with paragraphs 2 and 3 above, this certificate will, if not extended by the Registration Committee, automatically expire on 31 December, 2030.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. BENEDETTA GIAMMARIOLI may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Anesthesiology and Pain Medicine, University of Toronto, in which Dr. GIAMMARIOLI holds an academic appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of her academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from the date of issuance or when Dr. GIAMMARIOLI no longer holds the academic appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the College receives a report indicating that Dr. GIAMMARIOLI’s clinical performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or

(ii) the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. GIAMMARIOLI’s certificate of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment report.

Note: This certificate is issued on 01 January, 2024. In accordance with paragraphs 2 and 3 above, this certificate will, if not extended by the Registration Committee, automatically expire on 31 December, 2030.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Rome, 2012

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2024
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Dec 2023
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 28 Sep 2020
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jan 2024
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Jan 2024
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration by Registration Committee.
Date: Expiry: 31 Dec 2030

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Dec 2023

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Sep 2020