THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 03:31:27 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Arabian Gulf University College of Medicine and Medical Sciences, 2014
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 200 Elizabeth St
Toronto General Hospital
floor 1
Toronto ON M5G 2C4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 399 Bathurst St
Toronto Western Hospital
Toronto ON M5T 2S8
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Arabian Gulf University College of Medicine and Medical Sciences, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 200 Elizabeth St
Toronto General Hospital
floor 1
Toronto ON M5G 2C4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 399 Bathurst St
Toronto Western Hospital
Toronto ON M5T 2S8
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ABDULLAH MUHAYL G ALOTAIBI may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. ALOTAIBI is enrolled at University of Toronto;
(2) Dr. ALOTAIBI shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. ALOTAIBI is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. ALOTAIBI shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:
(i) When Dr. ALOTAIBI ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,
(ii) When Dr. ALOTAIBI ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or
(iii) When five years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2025.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ABDULLAH MUHAYL G ALOTAIBI may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. ALOTAIBI is enrolled at University of Toronto;
(2) Dr. ALOTAIBI shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. ALOTAIBI is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. ALOTAIBI shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:
(i) When Dr. ALOTAIBI ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,
(ii) When Dr. ALOTAIBI ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or
(iii) When five years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2025.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Arabian Gulf University College of Medicine and Medical Sciences, 2014
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology
01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology
23 Sep 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
University of Toronto
PEAP - CF - Gastroenterology
01 Jul 2023 to 22 Sep 2023
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology
DATE: 01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology
DATE: 23 Sep 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PEAP - CF - Gastroenterology
DATE: 01 Jul 2023 to 22 Sep 2023
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry: 30 Jun 2025
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2023
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 30 Jun 2025

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2023