THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
21/05/25 02:13:33 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2019
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 600 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-586-4800
Extension: 8563
Fax: 416-597-7066
Address: 600 University Avenue
Room 457, 4th Floor, Geriatrics Clinic
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X5
Phone: 416-586-4800
Extension: 8563
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Geriatric Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2024
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Geriatric Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Unity Health Toronto Toronto
University Health Network Toronto
Sinai Health System Toronto
Toronto East Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: Unity Health Toronto
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Toronto East Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2019

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 600 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-586-4800
Extension: 8563
Fax: 416-597-7066
Address: 600 University Avenue
Room 457, 4th Floor, Geriatrics Clinic
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X5
Phone: 416-586-4800
Extension: 8563
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Geriatric Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2024
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Geriatric Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Unity Health Toronto Toronto
University Health Network Toronto
Sinai Health System Toronto
Toronto East Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: Unity Health Toronto
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Toronto East Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PETER MINH HOANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HOANG is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PETER MINH HOANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HOANG is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2019

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Mar 2024
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 31 Jul 2023
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2023
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 17 Oct 2022
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2022
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 29 Aug 2021
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Aug 2021
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Mar 2024

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 31 Jul 2023

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2023

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Oct 2022
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 17 Oct 2022

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2022

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 29 Aug 2021

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Aug 2021