THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 03:24:11 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Ankara Üniversitesi Tıp Fakültesi, 1995
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1200-25 Main St W
HHS - McMaster Children's Hospital
Hamilton ON L8P 1H1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 10 Jan 2023
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
Pediatric Radiology
Effective: 10 Jan 2023
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 10 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

SPECIALTY: Pediatric Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 10 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Ankara Üniversitesi Tıp Fakültesi, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1200-25 Main St W
HHS - McMaster Children's Hospital
Hamilton ON L8P 1H1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 10 Jan 2023
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
Pediatric Radiology
Effective: 10 Jan 2023
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 10 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

SPECIALTY: Pediatric Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 10 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
21 Mar 2025
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Mar 21 2025
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. AYSE SECIL EKSIOGLU may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Radiology, Division of Pediatric Radiology, McMaster University, in which Dr. EKSIOGLU holds an academic appointment at the rank of Associate Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of her academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires when Dr. EKSIOGLU no longer holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. AYSE SECIL EKSIOGLU may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Radiology, Division of Pediatric Radiology, McMaster University, in which Dr. EKSIOGLU holds an academic appointment at the rank of Associate Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of her academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires when Dr. EKSIOGLU no longer holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Ankara Üniversitesi Tıp Fakültesi, 1995

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 12 Jan 2023
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Jan 2023
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 12 Jan 2023
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration by Registration Committee.
Date: Expiry: 30 Jun 2025